DAVILA CALIXTO et al v. ACOSTA et al

Plaintiff: JORGE PALAFOX JUAREZ, JOEL DAVILA CALIXTO, LEONARDO AVILES ROMERO, HILARIO OLVERA GUTIERREZ and HECTOR HERNANDEZ GOMEZ
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR, Secretary of Labor R. ALEXANDER ACOSTA and R. ALEXANDER ACOSTA
Case Number: 1:2019cv01853
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
Nature of Suit: Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:0706
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Defendants' #11 First Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendants assert that their Response is currently due August 26, 2019. Defendants request an extension of time in order to work with the Department of Labor to review and investigate the legal issues raised by the allegations in Plaintiffs' Complaint regarding the agency's regulatory authority to administer the H-2B program. Defendants' Motion is GRANTED. Defendants' Response is due SEPTEMBER 20, 2019. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 8-21-2019. (lcckk3)
August 21, 2019 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by R. ALEXANDER ACOSTA, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Kurlan, Elizabeth)
August 20, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Time to effectuate service upon party due by 9/22/2019. (dot)
August 20, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth D Kurlan on behalf of All Defendants (Kurlan, Elizabeth)
August 20, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. R. ALEXANDER ACOSTA served on 7/3/2019 (Pulver, Adam)
August 20, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 07/05/2019. (Pulver, Adam)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER on Service. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 8-20-2019. (lcckk3)
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Richard Botts on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Declaration re Representation of Indigents without Compensation under LCvR 83.2(g))(Botts, Benjamin)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 7/1/19. (DM)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael T. Kirkpatrick on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Kirkpatrick, Michael)
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/27/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/26/2019. (Pulver, Adam)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to R. ALEXANDER ACOSTA, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zeg)
June 27, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zeg)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6208771) filed by HILARIO OLVERA GUTIERREZ, JOEL DAVILA CALIXTO, LEONARDO AVILES ROMERO, HECTOR HERNANDEZ GOMEZ, JORGE PALAFOX JUAREZ. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Pulver, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DAVILA CALIXTO et al v. ACOSTA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JORGE PALAFOX JUAREZ
Represented By: Adam R. Pulver
Represented By: Michael T. Kirkpatrick
Represented By: Benjamin Richard Botts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOEL DAVILA CALIXTO
Represented By: Adam R. Pulver
Represented By: Michael T. Kirkpatrick
Represented By: Benjamin Richard Botts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEONARDO AVILES ROMERO
Represented By: Adam R. Pulver
Represented By: Michael T. Kirkpatrick
Represented By: Benjamin Richard Botts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HILARIO OLVERA GUTIERREZ
Represented By: Adam R. Pulver
Represented By: Michael T. Kirkpatrick
Represented By: Benjamin Richard Botts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HECTOR HERNANDEZ GOMEZ
Represented By: Adam R. Pulver
Represented By: Michael T. Kirkpatrick
Represented By: Benjamin Richard Botts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR
Represented By: Elizabeth D Kurlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of Labor R. ALEXANDER ACOSTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. ALEXANDER ACOSTA
Represented By: Elizabeth D Kurlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?