GROOP INTERNET PLATFORM INC. v. PSYCHOTHERAPY ACTION NETWORK et al

Plaintiff: GROOP INTERNET PLATFORM d/b/a TALKSPACE and GROOP INTERNET PLATFORM INC.
Defendant: PSYCHOTHERAPY ACTION NETWORK, NANCY BURKE, JANICE MUHR and LINDA MICHAELS
Case Number: 1:2019cv01854
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Beryl A Howell
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE by GROOP INTERNET PLATFORM INC.. NANCY BURKE waiver sent on 6/28/2019, answer due 8/27/2019. (Clare, Thomas)
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE by GROOP INTERNET PLATFORM INC.. LINDA MICHAELS waiver sent on 6/28/2019, answer due 8/27/2019. (Clare, Thomas)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE by GROOP INTERNET PLATFORM INC.. JANICE MUHR waiver sent on 6/28/2019, answer due 8/27/2019. (Clare, Thomas)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE by GROOP INTERNET PLATFORM INC.. PSYCHOTHERAPY ACTION NETWORK waiver sent on 6/28/2019, answer due 8/27/2019. (Clare, Thomas)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on June 26, 2019. (lcbah4)
June 25, 2019 SUMMONS Not Issued as to NANCY BURKE, LINDA MICHAELS, JANICE MUHR, PSYCHOTHERAPY ACTION NETWORK (zeg)
June 25, 2019 Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zeg)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 ERRATA to Correct Case Caption by GROOP INTERNET PLATFORM d/b/a TALKSPACE #1 Complaint filed by GROOP INTERNET PLATFORM d/b/a TALKSPACE. (Clare, Thomas)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6208863) filed by GROOP INTERNET PLATFORM INC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Clare, Thomas) Modified Text on 6/25/2019 (zeg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GROOP INTERNET PLATFORM INC. v. PSYCHOTHERAPY ACTION NETWORK et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PSYCHOTHERAPY ACTION NETWORK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NANCY BURKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANICE MUHR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LINDA MICHAELS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GROOP INTERNET PLATFORM d/b/a TALKSPACE
Represented By: Thomas A. Clare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GROOP INTERNET PLATFORM INC.
Represented By: Thomas A. Clare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?