STOKES v. BYT MEDIA INC.
Plaintiff: MICHAEL STOKES
Defendant: BYT MEDIA INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01896
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Randolph D Moss
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant shall file a responsive pleading or motion on or before 9/20/2019; Joint Status Report due by 9/20/2019. (kt)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendant's status report, Dkt. 13, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before September 20, 2019, identifying what, if any, issues remain in dispute and the proper next steps in this litigation. It is further ORDERED that Defendant's time to respond to Plaintiff's complaint is extended. Defendant shall file a responsive pleading or motion on or before September 20, 2019. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 08/21/2019. (lcrdm2, )
August 20, 2019 Filing 13 STATUS REPORT by BYT MEDIA INC.. (Gunderson, Eric)
August 20, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric William Gunderson on behalf of BYT MEDIA INC. (Gunderson, Eric)
August 5, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/20/2019. (kt)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to confer and to file a joint status report on or before August 20, 2019 regarding an appropriate course of action to govern further proceedings in this matter. Counsel who are not members of the Bar of this Court are referred to Local Rule 83.2(d) regarding the requirements for appearing pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 08/05/2019. (lcrdm2, )
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 6/27/2019. (lcrdm2, )
June 26, 2019 Filing 10 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:19-cv-04182. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 24, 2019 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of District of Columbia (rj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/26/2019.]
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TRANSFERRING VENUE: It is hereby: ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to transfer this matter to the District of Columbia shall be and is hereby GRANTED, and the Clerk is hereby directed to make the necessary arrangements to transfer this matter to that District; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that the time within which Defendant must file its Answer or other pleading in response to the Complaint is extended to and including fourteen (14) days after the entry of this Order Transferring Venue. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 6/6/2019) (rj) Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/26/2019.]
June 5, 2019 Filing 8 LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Alexander H. Gillespie dated 6/5/19 re: Letter-Motion for Order Transferring Venue. Document filed by BYT Media Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit Order transferring venue)(Gillespie, Alexander) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/26/2019.]
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. SO ORDERED. BYT Media Inc. answer due 6/17/2019. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 6/3/2019) (rj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/26/2019.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Alexander H. Gillespie dated May 31, 2019. Document filed by BYT Media Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Gillespie, Alexander) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/26/2019.]
May 13, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. BYT Media Inc. served on 5/13/2019, answer due 6/3/2019. Document filed by Michael Stokes. (Liebowitz, Richard) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/26/2019.]
May 10, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Liebowitz, Richard) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/26/2019.]
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to BYT Media Inc.. (dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/26/2019.]
May 9, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/26/2019.]
May 9, 2019 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/26/2019.]
May 9, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/26/2019.]
May 9, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT. Notice to Attorney Richard Liebowitz to submit a completed AO 121 Form Copyright to court for review. Use the event type AO 121 Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/26/2019.]
May 9, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Richard Liebowitz. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/26/2019.]
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BYT Media Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Michael Stokes. (Liebowitz, Richard) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/26/2019.]
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BYT Media Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16849196)Document filed by Michael Stokes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Liebowitz, Richard) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/26/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STOKES v. BYT MEDIA INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BYT MEDIA INC.
Represented By: Eric William Gunderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL STOKES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?