AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR JUSTICE v. ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN TRIAL LAWYERS, LLC

Plaintiff: AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR JUSTICE and ASSOCIATION OF TRIAL LAWYERS OF AMERICA
Defendant: ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN TRIAL LAWYERS, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01944
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Richard J Leon
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Filing 7 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent and/or trademark. (znmw)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 7/29/2019. (lcrjl2)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' consent #5 Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the time for defendant to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint is extended to and including September 2, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 7/29/2019. (lcrjl2)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. It is hereby ORDERED that Christopher K. Larus is admitted pro hac vice to represent plaintiff American Association for Justice a/k/a Association of Trial Lawyers of America in this case. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 7/29/2019. (lcrjl2)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. It is hereby ORDERED that Taylor Y. Moore-Willis is admitted pro hac vice to represent plaintiff American Association for Justice a/k/a Association of Trial Lawyers of America in this case. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 7/29/2019. (lcrjl2)
July 23, 2019 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR JUSTICE (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nace, Christopher)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Christopher K. Larus, :Firm- Robins Kaplan LLP, :Address- 800 LaSalle Avenue, Minneapolis, MN 55402. Phone No. - (612) 349-0116. Fax No. - (612) 339-4181 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6259147. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR JUSTICE (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Nace, Christopher)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Taylor Y. Moore-Willis, :Firm- Robins Kaplan LLP, :Address- 800 LaSalle Avenue, Minneapolis, MD 55402. Phone No. - (612)349-0116. Fax No. - (612)339-4181 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6259083. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR JUSTICE (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Nace, Christopher)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN TRIAL LAWYERS, LLC. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zeg)
July 2, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard J. Leon. (zeg)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6221439) filed by AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR JUSTICE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons)(Nace, Christopher) (Attachment 6 replaced on 7/2/2019) (zeg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR JUSTICE v. ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN TRIAL LAWYERS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR JUSTICE
Represented By: Christopher T. Nace
Represented By: Christopher K. Larus
Represented By: Taylor Y. Moore-Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASSOCIATION OF TRIAL LAWYERS OF AMERICA
Represented By: Christopher K. Larus
Represented By: Taylor Y. Moore-Willis
Represented By: Christopher T. Nace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN TRIAL LAWYERS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?