JOHNSON v. SAUL
Plaintiff: FRANCES JOHNSON
Defendant: ANDREW M. SAUL
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 1:2019cv01950
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Tanya S Chutkan
Referring Judge: Deborah A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XV1
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 CASE RANDOMLY REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson for full case management up to and including issuance of a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive motions, but excluding trial. (zad)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: The Court has determined that this action should be referred to a Magistrate Judge for full case management up to and including issuance of a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive motions, but excluding trial. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that this matter is referred to a Magistrate Judge, beginning immediately; the Magistrate Judge will be randomly assigned by the Clerk's Office; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that any future filings related to this matter shall have the initials of the presiding judge and the magistrate judge following the case number in the caption. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 8/22/19. (DJS)
July 31, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ANDREW M. SAUL served on 7/25/2019 (ztd)
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 7/18/2019. RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/18/2019. (Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/16/2019.) (tth)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ANDREW M. SAUL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zeg)
July 5, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zmc)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FIAT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. "Leave to file without prepayment of costs GRANTED." Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 07/02/2019. (zmc)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by FRANCES JOHNSON (Attachment: #1 Supplement)(zmc)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ANDREW M. SAUL filed by FRANCES JOHNSON. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(zmc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/1/2019: #2 Summons) (zmc).
June 28, 2019 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 06/28/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zmc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JOHNSON v. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW M. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANCES JOHNSON
Represented By: Stephen F. Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?