SELLERS v. CONCRETE MIXES, INC.
Plaintiff: TAHKINA T. SELLERS
Defendant: CONCRETE MIXES, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01961
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Tanya S Chutkan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Filing 9 REPLY to opposition to motion re #6 Partial MOTION to Dismiss filed by CONCRETE MIXES, INC.. (McEvoy, Timothy)
August 12, 2019 Filing 8 Memorandum in opposition to re #6 Partial MOTION to Dismiss filed by TAHKINA T. SELLERS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brown, Carla)
July 29, 2019 Filing 7 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CONCRETE MIXES, INC. (Sorensen, Matthew)
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 Partial MOTION to Dismiss by CONCRETE MIXES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sorensen, Matthew)
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 Partial ANSWER to Complaint by CONCRETE MIXES, INC..(Sorensen, Matthew)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CONCRETE MIXES, INC. served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019 (Brown, Carla)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to CONCRETE MIXES, INC.. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zeg)
July 3, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zeg)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 ERRATA (Corrected Civil Cover Sheet) by TAHKINA T. SELLERS #1 Complaint filed by CONCRETE MIXES, INC.. (Brown, Carla)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CONCRETE MIXES, INC. with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6225905) filed by CONCRETE MIXES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Brown, Carla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SELLERS v. CONCRETE MIXES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONCRETE MIXES, INC.
Represented By: Carla Denette Brown
Represented By: Matthew Harrold Sorensen
Represented By: Timothy J. McEvoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAHKINA T. SELLERS
Represented By: Carla Denette Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?