MEDICAL CENTER OF MESQUITE et al v. AZAR
Plaintiff: JOHNSTON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, EAST GEORGIA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, JOHNSON CITY MEDICAL CENTER, SAINT LUKES HOSPITAL OF KANSAS CITY, WHITTIER HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, TENNOVA HEALTHCARE LEBANON, MONTEREY PARK HOSPITAL, CAROLINA PINES REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, ANAHEIM REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, MERIT HEALTH RANKIN, MERIT HEALTH CENTRAL, ASCENSION VIA CHRISTI HOSPITAL IN MANHATTAN, UPMC PINNACLE LANCASTER, MERIT HEALTH RIVER OAKS, BAYFRONT HEALTH BROOKSVILLE, HOLSTON VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, SAN GABRIEL VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, NORTHWEST MISSISSIPPI MEDICAL CENTER, UNICOI COUNTY HOSPITAL, SEVEN RIVERS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, UNITED HOSPITAL CENTER, JOHNSON CITY SPECIALTY HOSPITAL, BERKLEY MEDICAL CENTER, THE MEDICAL CENTER OF MESQUITE, MOUNTAIN VIEW REGIONAL HOSPITAL, SANTA ROSA MEDICAL CENTER, MERIT HEALTH BILOXI, RUSSELL COUNTY HOSPITAL, HONORHEALTH SCOTTSDALE-OSBORN MEDICAL CENTER, LAKE NORMAN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, HEART OF FLORIDA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, TENNOVA HEALTHCARE - HARTON, MUSC HEALTH CHESTER MEDICAL CENTER, INDIAN PATH COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, GREATER EL MONTE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, BAKERSFIELD HEART HOSPITAL, HAWKINS COUNTY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, NOVANT HEALTH FRANKLIN MEDICAL CENTER, SMYTH COUNTY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, DAVIS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, ASTRIA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, ALLIANCEHEALTH DURANT, FRANKLIN WOODS COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, SYCAMORE SHOALS HOSPITAL, GARFIELD MEDICAL CENTER, NORTON COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, POPLAR BLUFF REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER-OAK GROVE, RMC STRINGFELLOW MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, SAINT LUKES EAST HOSPITAL, LONESOME PINE HOSPITAL and MEDICAL CENTER OF MESQUITE
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Case Number: 1:2019cv01968
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Christopher R Cooper
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing of Reply in Support of Motion to Consolidate by ALEX M. AZAR, II (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Reply ISO Motion to Consolidate)(Orloff, Serena)
August 5, 2019 Cases Consolidated. Cases 18cv222 CRC and 19cv1968 CRC have been consolidated pursuant to Minute Order entered 8/5/2019. All future filings in this case shall be made on the docket of case 18-cv-222. The parties are advised NOT to select the SPREAD TEXT option when filing in ECF, as this will result in repetitive docketing and emails. (ztd)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that case 19-cv-1968 is CONSOLIDATED with consolidated case 18-cv-222 pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42(a) (permitting sua sponte consolidation of cases presenting common questions of law or fact). All future filings in this case shall be made on the docket of case 18-cv-222. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 8/5/2019. (lccrc1)
August 2, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Motion to Consolidate by ALEX M. AZAR, II (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Motion to Consolidate)(Orloff, Serena)
July 24, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 7/16/2019 (Marcus, Kenneth)
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 07/16/2019. (Marcus, Kenneth)
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/16/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/14/2019. (Marcus, Kenneth)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zeg)
July 10, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zeg)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 18-0222. (Marcus, Kenneth)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ALLIANCEHEALTH DURANT, ANAHEIM REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, ASCENSION VIA CHRISTI HOSPITAL IN MANHATTAN, ASTRIA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, BAKERSFIELD HEART HOSPITAL, BAYFRONT HEALTH BROOKSVILLE, BERKLEY MEDICAL CENTER, CAROLINA PINES REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, DAVIS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, EAST GEORGIA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, FRANKLIN WOODS COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, GARFIELD MEDICAL CENTER, GREATER EL MONTE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, HAWKINS COUNTY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, HEART OF FLORIDA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, HOLSTON VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, HONORHEALTH SCOTTSDALE-OSBORN MEDICAL CENTER, INDIAN PATH COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, JOHNSON CITY MEDICAL CENTER, JOHNSON CITY SPECIALTY HOSPITAL, JOHNSTON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, LAKE NORMAN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, MERIT HEALTH BILOXI, MERIT HEALTH CENTRAL, MERIT HEALTH RANKIN, MERIT HEALTH RIVER OAKS, MONTEREY PARK HOSPITAL, MOUNTAIN VIEW REGIONAL HOSPITAL, MUSC HEALTH CHESTER MEDICAL CENTER, NORTHWEST MISSISSIPPI MEDICAL CENTER, NORTON COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, NOVANT HEALTH FRANKLIN MEDICAL CENTER, POPLAR BLUFF REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER-OAK GROVE, RMC STRINGFELLOW MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, RUSSELL COUNTY HOSPITAL, SAINT LUKES EAST HOSPITAL, SAINT LUKES HOSPITAL OF KANSAS CITY, SAN GABRIEL VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, SANTA ROSA MEDICAL CENTER, SEVEN RIVERS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, SMYTH COUNTY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, SYCAMORE SHOALS HOSPITAL, TENNOVA HEALTHCARE - HARTON, TENNOVA HEALTHCARE LEBANON, THE MEDICAL CENTER OF MESQUITE, UNICOI COUNTY HOSPITAL, UNITED HOSPITAL CENTER, UPMC PINNACLE LANCASTER, WHITTIER HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER (Marcus, Kenneth)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW AND DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against ALEX M. AZAR, II SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6227398) filed by SYCAMORE SHOALS HOSPITAL, ANAHEIM REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, TENNOVA HEALTHCARE - HARTON, EAST GEORGIA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, SAINT LUKES HOSPITAL OF KANSAS CITY, RMC STRINGFELLOW MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, ALLIANCEHEALTH DURANT, THE MEDICAL CENTER OF MESQUITE, UPMC PINNACLE LANCASTER, GREATER EL MONTE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, DAVIS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, UNITED HOSPITAL CENTER, WHITTIER HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, ASCENSION VIA CHRISTI HOSPITAL IN MANHATTAN, MONTEREY PARK HOSPITAL, FRANKLIN WOODS COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, NOVANT HEALTH FRANKLIN MEDICAL CENTER, MUSC HEALTH CHESTER MEDICAL CENTER, MOUNTAIN VIEW REGIONAL HOSPITAL, HONORHEALTH SCOTTSDALE-OSBORN MEDICAL CENTER, MERIT HEALTH CENTRAL, SAN GABRIEL VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, JOHNSON CITY SPECIALTY HOSPITAL, MERIT HEALTH RANKIN, HAWKINS COUNTY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, UNICOI COUNTY HOSPITAL, TENNOVA HEALTHCARE LEBANON, SAINT LUKES EAST HOSPITAL, POPLAR BLUFF REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER-OAK GROVE, ASTRIA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, GARFIELD MEDICAL CENTER, SEVEN RIVERS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, NORTON COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, BAYFRONT HEALTH BROOKSVILLE, INDIAN PATH COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, NORTHWEST MISSISSIPPI MEDICAL CENTER, SMYTH COUNTY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, MERIT HEALTH RIVER OAKS, HOLSTON VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, LAKE NORMAN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, JOHNSTON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, MERIT HEALTH BILOXI, SANTA ROSA MEDICAL CENTER, JOHNSON CITY MEDICAL CENTER, RUSSELL COUNTY HOSPITAL, BERKLEY MEDICAL CENTER, BAKERSFIELD HEART HOSPITAL, CAROLINA PINES REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, HEART OF FLORIDA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Summons SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, #10 Summons ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE UNITED STATES, #11 Summons UNITED STATES ATTORNEY)(Marcus, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MEDICAL CENTER OF MESQUITE et al v. AZAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHNSTON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EAST GEORGIA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHNSON CITY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAINT LUKES HOSPITAL OF KANSAS CITY
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WHITTIER HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TENNOVA HEALTHCARE LEBANON
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MONTEREY PARK HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAROLINA PINES REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANAHEIM REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MERIT HEALTH RANKIN
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MERIT HEALTH CENTRAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASCENSION VIA CHRISTI HOSPITAL IN MANHATTAN
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UPMC PINNACLE LANCASTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MERIT HEALTH RIVER OAKS
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAYFRONT HEALTH BROOKSVILLE
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOLSTON VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAN GABRIEL VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NORTHWEST MISSISSIPPI MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNICOI COUNTY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SEVEN RIVERS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED HOSPITAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHNSON CITY SPECIALTY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BERKLEY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE MEDICAL CENTER OF MESQUITE
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOUNTAIN VIEW REGIONAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SANTA ROSA MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MERIT HEALTH BILOXI
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RUSSELL COUNTY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HONORHEALTH SCOTTSDALE-OSBORN MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAKE NORMAN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HEART OF FLORIDA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TENNOVA HEALTHCARE - HARTON
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MUSC HEALTH CHESTER MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INDIAN PATH COMMUNITY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GREATER EL MONTE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAKERSFIELD HEART HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HAWKINS COUNTY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NOVANT HEALTH FRANKLIN MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SMYTH COUNTY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVIS REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASTRIA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLIANCEHEALTH DURANT
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANKLIN WOODS COMMUNITY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SYCAMORE SHOALS HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GARFIELD MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NORTON COMMUNITY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: POPLAR BLUFF REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER-OAK GROVE
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RMC STRINGFELLOW MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAINT LUKES EAST HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LONESOME PINE HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MEDICAL CENTER OF MESQUITE
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?