SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION NATIONAL INDUSTRY PENSION FUND et al v. NEW IMAGE BUILDING SERVICES, INC.

Plaintiff: EMANUEL PASTREICH, RODERICK S. BASHIR, STEPHEN ABRECHT, KEVIN MCGARR, THOMAS LAMARTINA, INGA CRAREY, CHRISTOPHER B. BOUVIER, JOHN J. SHERIDAN, DAVID HUERTA, SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION NATIONAL INDUSTRY PENSION FUND, EDWARD J. MANKO, APRIL VERRETT and FRANK A. MAXSON
Defendant: NEW IMAGE BUILDING SERVICES, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01975
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Royce C Lamberth
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant New Image Building Services, Inc. by STEPHEN ABRECHT, RODERICK S. BASHIR, CHRISTOPHER B. BOUVIER, INGA CRAREY, DAVID HUERTA, THOMAS LAMARTINA, EDWARD J. MANKO, FRANK A. MAXSON, KEVIN MCGARR, EMANUEL PASTREICH, SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION NATIONAL INDUSTRY PENSION FUND, JOHN J. SHERIDAN, APRIL VERRETT (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Kisha Smith, #3 Declaration of Olga M. Thall, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Thall, Olga)
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to NEW IMAGE BUILDING SERVICES, INC. (jf)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT FOR DEFAULT as to Defendant New Image Building Services, Inc. by STEPHEN ABRECHT, RODERICK S. BASHIR, CHRISTOPHER B. BOUVIER, INGA CRAREY, DAVID HUERTA, THOMAS LAMARTINA, EDWARD J. MANKO, FRANK A. MAXSON, KEVIN MCGARR, EMANUEL PASTREICH, SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION NATIONAL INDUSTRY PENSION FUND, JOHN J. SHERIDAN, APRIL VERRETT. (Thall, Olga)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NEW IMAGE BUILDING SERVICES, INC. served on 7/9/2019, answer due 7/30/2019 (Thall, Olga)
July 5, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to NEW IMAGE BUILDING SERVICES, INC.. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zeg)
July 5, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (zeg)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NEW IMAGE BUILDING SERVICES, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6229832) filed by APRIL VERRETT, JOHN J. SHERIDAN, RODERICK S. BASHIR, EDWARD J. MANKO, INGA CRAREY, KEVIN MCGARR, STEPHEN ABRECHT, CHRISTOPHER B. BOUVIER, SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION NATIONAL INDUSTRY PENSION FUND, DAVID HUERTA, THOMAS LAMARTINA, FRANK A. MAXSON, EMANUEL PASTREICH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Summons)(Thall, Olga)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION NATIONAL INDUSTRY PENSION FUND et al v. NEW IMAGE BUILDING SERVICES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMANUEL PASTREICH
Represented By: Olga Metelitsa Thall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RODERICK S. BASHIR
Represented By: Olga Metelitsa Thall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHEN ABRECHT
Represented By: Olga Metelitsa Thall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVIN MCGARR
Represented By: Olga Metelitsa Thall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS LAMARTINA
Represented By: Olga Metelitsa Thall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INGA CRAREY
Represented By: Olga Metelitsa Thall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER B. BOUVIER
Represented By: Olga Metelitsa Thall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN J. SHERIDAN
Represented By: Olga Metelitsa Thall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID HUERTA
Represented By: Olga Metelitsa Thall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION NATIONAL INDUSTRY PENSION FUND
Represented By: Olga Metelitsa Thall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWARD J. MANKO
Represented By: Olga Metelitsa Thall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: APRIL VERRETT
Represented By: Olga Metelitsa Thall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANK A. MAXSON
Represented By: Olga Metelitsa Thall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEW IMAGE BUILDING SERVICES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?