MERSHMAN v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Plaintiff: JAMES BERN MERSHMAN
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 1:2019cv02007
Filed: July 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Dabney L Friedrich
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re #3 Summons Issued Electronically as to AUSA was entered in error (Incorrect summonses issued - foreign defendant summons used), refiled as #4 SUMMONS REISSUED. (zrdj)
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (3) REISSUED as to COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, and non-parties U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zrdj) (zrdj).
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting the plaintiff's #2 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Edward A. Wickland. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on July 11, 2019. (lcdlf2)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 ENTERED IN ERROR.....SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj) Modified on 7/19/2019 (zrdj).
July 8, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zrdj)
July 5, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Edward A. Wicklund, :Firm- Olinsky Law Group, :Address- 300 S. State Street, Ste. 420. Phone No. - 315-701-5780. Fax No. - 315-701-5781 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6236218. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by JAMES BERN MERSHMAN (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Shea, Stephen)
July 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6236203) filed by JAMES BERN MERSHMAN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons)(Shea, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MERSHMAN v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES BERN MERSHMAN
Represented By: Stephen F. Shea
Represented By: Edward A. Wicklund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?