GULLETT v. DUFF et al
Plaintiff: TAQUAN GULLETT
Defendant: SCOTT S. HARRIS, JAMES C. DUFF, WILLIAM P. BARR, CLAYTON R. HIGGINS, JR., INSPECTOR GENERAL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, LEE ANN BENNETT, ROBERT S. MUELLER, III and UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2019cv02015
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition: Civil Rights (Other)
Cause of Action: 05:0706
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Filing 14 Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re #13 Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis ;USCA Case Number 19-5217. (zsb)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 08/26/2019. (zsb)
August 22, 2019 Filing 12 Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re #11 Supplement #7 Notice of Appeal ;USCA Case Number 19-5217. (zrdj)
August 19, 2019 Filing 10 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by TAQUAN GULLETT (zrdj)
August 19, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by TAQUAN GULLETT (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(zrdj)
August 14, 2019 Filing 11 SUPPLEMENT re #7 Notice of Appeal filed by TAQUAN GULLETT. (zrdj)
August 14, 2019 USCA Case Number 19-5217 for #7 Notice of Appeal filed by TAQUAN GULLETT. (zrdj)
August 9, 2019 Filing 8 Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The fee remains to be paid and another notice will be transmitted when the fee has been paid in the District Court re #7 Notice of Appeal. (zrdj)
August 2, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #5 Memorandum & Opinion, #6 Order Dismissing Pro Se Case, by TAQUAN GULLETT. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(zrdj)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DISMISSING PRO SE CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Ordered that the application of the plaintiff to proceed in forma pauperis is granted. This is a final appealable Order. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 07/23/2019. (zsb)
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 07/23/2019. (zsb)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Request to Serve Respondent by TAQUAN GULLETT (zmc)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by TAQUAN GULLETT (zmc)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by TAQUAN GULLETT (zmc)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against WILLIAM P. BARR, LEE ANN BENNETT, JAMES C. DUFF, SCOTT S. HARRIS, CLAYTON R. HIGGINS, JR, INSPECTOR GENERAL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, ROBERT S. MUELLER, III, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA filed by TAQUAN GULLETT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(zmc)
July 3, 2019 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 07/03/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zmc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GULLETT v. DUFF et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTT S. HARRIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES C. DUFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM P. BARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLAYTON R. HIGGINS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INSPECTOR GENERAL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEE ANN BENNETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT S. MUELLER, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAQUAN GULLETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?