MALIBU MEDIA, LLC v. DOE
Plaintiff: MALIBU MEDIA, LLC
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Case Number: 1:2019cv02025
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiff's #6 Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file a further status report by September 9, 2019. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 8/21/2019. (lctjk1)
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 STATUS REPORT by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC. (Hoppe, Jon)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting Plaintiff's #4 Motion to Expedite Discovery. Status Report due August 21, 2019. See Opinion and Order for details. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 7/18/2019. (lctjk1)
July 10, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zeg)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Expedite Discovery by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Hoppe, Jon)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC (Hoppe, Jon)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC (Hoppe, Jon) Modified event title on 7/18/2019 (znmw).
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages for Property Rights Infringement against JOHN DOE with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6240658) filed by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Hoppe, Jon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MALIBU MEDIA, LLC v. DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MALIBU MEDIA, LLC
Represented By: Jon A. Hoppe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?