FORD-BEY v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Plaintiff: ISMAEL FORD-BEY
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2019cv02039
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Beryl A Howell
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 NOTICE OF ERROR re #20 Notice (Other); emailed to john.truong@usdoj.gov, cc'd 1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Incorrect header/caption/case number, 2. Please refile document (ztd, )
August 27, 2019 Filing 20 ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .NOTICE of Supplemental Exhibits in Support of ECF No. 18 by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Exh. 1-3)(Truong, John) Modified on 8/28/2019 (ztd).
August 9, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Dispositive Motion due by 9/9/2019. (tg)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER advising the plaintiff Ismael Ford-Bey to respond, by September 9, 2019, to the defendant's #18 Motion to Dismiss the Complaint or the Court may grant the motion as conceded. See Order for further details. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on August 9, 2019. (lcbah4)
August 8, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Gov. Exhs. A to D)(Truong, John)
August 8, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order,, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Gov. Exhs. A to D)(Truong, John)
July 25, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's supplemental response to the Complaint due by 8/8/2019. (tg)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the defendant's #16 Motion for an Extension of Time. Accordingly, the defendant must file, by August 8, 2019, any supplemental response, including all relevant exhibits, to the plaintiff's pro se #1 Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on July 25, 2019. (lcbah4)
July 25, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Supplemental Response by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Truong, John)
July 11, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Government's supplemental response, if any, due by 7/25/2019. (tg)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING the government to file, by July 25, 2019, any supplemental response, including all relevant exhibits, to the plaintiff's pro se #1 Complaint, which was filed in relation to the plaintiff's criminal case in the United States District Court of Maryland but was transferred to this Court because "[a]fter criminal proceedings are over, a Rule 41(g) motion must be filed in the district where the property was seized." See #13 Order Directing Clerk to Transfer Case. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on July 11, 2019. (lcbah4)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on July 11, 2019. (lcbah4)
July 10, 2019 Filing 14 Case transferred in from District of Maryland; Case Number 8:19-cv-00487. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Directing Clerk to Transfer case to the United States District Court for the District of Columbia for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 7/9/2019. (km4s, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/10/2019.]
July 5, 2019 Filing 12 Reply to the Government's Response in Opposition re #6 Response re #1 Complaint filed by Ismael Ford-Bey. (km4s, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/10/2019.]
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #10 motion to withdraw motion for extension of time and WITHDRAWING #9 motion for extension of time (c/m to Plaintiff along with a copy of ECF No. 10 6/11/19 sat). Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 6/11/2019. (Chasanow, Deborah) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/10/2019.]
June 6, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Withdraw #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by United States of America(Fine, Tamera) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/10/2019.]
May 28, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by United States of America(Fine, Tamera) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/10/2019.]
May 28, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Tamera Lynn Fine on behalf of United States of America (Fine, Tamera) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/10/2019.]
May 28, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Patrick Windom on behalf of United States of America (Windom, Thomas) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/10/2019.]
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1 Complaint by United States of America. (Windom, Thomas) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/10/2019.]
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #2 Motion for production of documents; granting the Government 60 days to file a response. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 3/29/2019. (cm/em as directed 03/29/2019 - jf3s, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/10/2019.]
March 25, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 84637034079 (sp2, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/10/2019.]
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing Plaintiff to file either the $400.00 filing fee or an indigency motion within 21 days. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 3/7/2019. (kns, Deputy Clerk)(c/m as directed 3/7/19) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/10/2019.]
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Ismael Ford-Bey. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/10/2019.]
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Production of Documents Related to the Defendant's Motion for the Return of His Property, by Ismael Ford-Bey. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/10/2019.]
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Motion for Return of Seized Property) against United States of America, filed by Ismael Ford-Bey. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit List, #3 Envelope)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 7/10/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FORD-BEY v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ISMAEL FORD-BEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: John Cuong Truong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?