LIU v. AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY
Plaintiff: ZHOUHONG LIU
Defendant: AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY
Case Number: 1:2019cv02048
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Carl J Nichols
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff Response To Defendant's #5 Motion To Consolidate And To Dismiss due by 10/14/2019. (mac)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of Plaintiff's #6 Motion for Extension of Time and considering that Defendant has not filed an opposition, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED and that Plaintiff shall file a response to Defendant's #5 Motion to Consolidate and to Dismiss on or before October 14, 2019. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on August 16, 2019. (lccjn1)
July 26, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time by ZHOUHONG LIU (jf)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , MOTION to Dismiss by AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Remy, John)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY (Remy, John)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE to Counsel/Party (zeg)
July 11, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zeg)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. Case related to Case No. 1:18-cv-02987. (Remy, John) (Main Document 2 replaced on 7/11/2019) (zeg).
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the District of Columbia, case number 2019 CA 003020 Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0090-6245246 filed by AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Remy, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LIU v. AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZHOUHONG LIU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY
Represented By: John Michael Remy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?