CARTER v. SAUL
Plaintiff: TOMMY CARTER
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 1:2019cv02049
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: James E Boasberg
Referring Judge: Robin M Meriweather
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XV1
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 CASE RANDOMLY REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather for full case management. (zad)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING Case to Random Magistrate Judge for Full Case Management. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/26/2019. (lcjeb2)
July 26, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zmc)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 FIAT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. "Leave to file without prepayment of costs GRANTED," Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 07/24/2019. (zmc) Modified to add text on 8/27/2019 (znmw).
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance- Pro Bono by Curt D. Campbell, Jr on behalf of TOMMY CARTER (zrdj)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance- Pro Bono by Jennifer F. Mezey on behalf of TOMMY CARTER (zrdj)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Heuer Levy on behalf of TOMMY CARTER (zrdj)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by TOMMY CARTER (zrdj)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ANDREW SAUL filed by TOMMY CARTER.(zrdj)
July 10, 2019 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 7/10/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zrdj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CARTER v. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TOMMY CARTER
Represented By: Jonathan Heuer Levy
Represented By: Jennifer F. Mezey
Represented By: Curt D. Campbell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?