JIMENEZ v. MCALEENAN
Plaintiff: ROLANDO R. JIMENEZ
Defendant: KEVIN K. MCALEENAN
Not Yet Classified: KEVIN MCALEENAN
Case Number: 1:2019cv02055
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Christopher R Cooper
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. KEVIN MCALEENAN served on 7/17/2019 (Wallace, Krista)
July 18, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/16/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/14/2019. (Wallace, Krista)
July 18, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General July 16, 2019. (Wallace, Krista)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to KEVIN MCALEENAN, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zeg)
July 11, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zeg)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by ROLANDO R. JIMENEZ. Case related to Case No. 17-cv-2731-CRC. (zeg)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KEVIN MCALEENAN with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6246061) filed by ROLANDO R. JIMENEZ. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Notice to Counsel/Party Notice of Related Case)(Wallace, Krista) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/11/2019) (zeg). Modified docket text on 7/11/2019 (zeg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JIMENEZ v. MCALEENAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: KEVIN MCALEENAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROLANDO R. JIMENEZ
Represented By: Krista Kate Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN K. MCALEENAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?