WEINGARTEN et al v. DEVOS et al
Plaintiff: CYNTHIA MILLER, CONNIE WAKEFIELD, DEBORAH BAKER, KELLY FINLAW, RANDI WEINGARTEN, JANELLE MENZEL, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF TEACHERS, AFL-CIO, MICHAEL GIAMBONA, CRYSTAL ADAMS and GLORIA NOLAN
Defendant: ELISABETH DEVOS and UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
Case Number: 1:2019cv02056
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Dabney L Friedrich
Nature of Suit: Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:0706
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Filing 18 Joint MOTION for Briefing Schedule and to Stay Rule 26(f) Deadlines by ELISABETH DEVOS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kossak, Jonathan). Added MOTION to Stay on 9/5/2019 (znmw).
August 9, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan D. Kossak on behalf of All Defendants (Kossak, Jonathan)
August 9, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark H. Richard on behalf of AMERICAN FEDERATION OF TEACHERS, AFL-CIO, RANDI WEINGARTEN (Richard, Mark)
July 29, 2019 Filing 15 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ELISABETH DEVOS served on 7/16/2019; UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION served on 7/16/2019, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 7/16/19., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/16/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/14/2019.) (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipts)(Siller, Margaret)
July 29, 2019 Filing 14 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/16/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/14/2019. (Siller, Margaret)
July 29, 2019 Filing 13 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 7/15/2019. (Siller, Margaret)
July 29, 2019 Filing 12 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION served on 7/15/2019 (Siller, Margaret)
July 29, 2019 Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ELISABETH DEVOS served on 7/15/2019 (Siller, Margaret)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting the plaintiff's #2 , #3 , #4 , #5 , and #6 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on July 11, 2019. (lcdlf3)
July 11, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to ELISABETH DEVOS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zeg)
July 11, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zeg)
July 11, 2019 Filing 9 CIVIL COVER SHEET by DEBORAH BAKER, CYNTHIA MILLER, JANELLE MENZEL, GLORIA NOLAN, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF TEACHERS, AFL-CIO, KELLY FINLAW, RANDI WEINGARTEN, CRYSTAL ADAMS, MICHAEL GIAMBONA, CONNIE WAKEFIELD re #1 Complaint, filed by DEBORAH BAKER, CYNTHIA MILLER, JANELLE MENZEL, GLORIA NOLAN, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF TEACHERS, AFL-CIO, KELLY FINLAW, RANDI WEINGARTEN, CRYSTAL ADAMS, MICHAEL GIAMBONA, CONNIE WAKEFIELD. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by KELLY FINLAW, GLORIA NOLAN, RANDI WEINGARTEN, CYNTHIA MILLER, CRYSTAL ADAMS, MICHAEL GIAMBONA, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF TEACHERS, AFL-CIO, JANELLE MENZEL, DEBORAH BAKER, CONNIE WAKEFIELD.(Siller, Margaret)
July 11, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Robyn K. Bitner on behalf of AMERICAN FEDERATION OF TEACHERS, AFL-CIO, RANDI WEINGARTEN (Bitner, Robyn)
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel A. Zibel on behalf of AMERICAN FEDERATION OF TEACHERS, AFL-CIO, RANDI WEINGARTEN (Zibel, Daniel)
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Aaron Ament, :Firm- National Student Legal Defense Network, :Address- 1015 15th Street NW, Suite 600, Washington, D.C. 20005. Phone No. - 212-734-7495. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6246252. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CRYSTAL ADAMS, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF TEACHERS, AFL-CIO, DEBORAH BAKER, KELLY FINLAW, MICHAEL GIAMBONA, JANELLE MENZEL, CYNTHIA MILLER, GLORIA NOLAN, CONNIE WAKEFIELD, RANDI WEINGARTEN (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Siller, Margaret)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Maria Ginzburg, :Firm- Selendy & Gay PLLC, :Address- 1290 Avenue of the Americas, 17th Floor, New York, NY 10104. Phone No. - 212-390-9006. Fax No. - 212-390-9399 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6246236. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CRYSTAL ADAMS, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF TEACHERS, AFL-CIO, DEBORAH BAKER, KELLY FINLAW, MICHAEL GIAMBONA, JANELLE MENZEL, CYNTHIA MILLER, GLORIA NOLAN, CONNIE WAKEFIELD, RANDI WEINGARTEN (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Siller, Margaret) (Attachment 2 replaced on 7/11/2019) (ztd).
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Caitlin Halligan, :Firm- Selendy & Gay PLLC, :Address- 1290 Avenue of the Americas, 17th Floor, New York, NY 10104. Phone No. - 212-390-9013. Fax No. - 212-390-9399 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6246226. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CRYSTAL ADAMS, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF TEACHERS, AFL-CIO, DEBORAH BAKER, KELLY FINLAW, MICHAEL GIAMBONA, JANELLE MENZEL, CYNTHIA MILLER, GLORIA NOLAN, CONNIE WAKEFIELD, RANDI WEINGARTEN (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Siller, Margaret)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Yelena Konanova, :Firm- Selendy & Gay PLLC, :Address- 1290 Avenue of the Americas, 17th Floor, New York, NY 10104. Phone No. - 212-390-9010. Fax No. - 212-390-9399 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6246214. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CRYSTAL ADAMS, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF TEACHERS, AFL-CIO, DEBORAH BAKER, KELLY FINLAW, MICHAEL GIAMBONA, JANELLE MENZEL, CYNTHIA MILLER, GLORIA NOLAN, CONNIE WAKEFIELD, RANDI WEINGARTEN (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Siller, Margaret)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Faith E. Gay, :Firm- Selendy & Gay PLLC, :Address- 1290 Avenue of the Americas, 17th Floor, New York, NY 10104. Phone No. - 212-390-9001. Fax No. - 212-390-9399 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6246179. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CRYSTAL ADAMS, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF TEACHERS, AFL-CIO, DEBORAH BAKER, KELLY FINLAW, MICHAEL GIAMBONA, JANELLE MENZEL, CYNTHIA MILLER, GLORIA NOLAN, CONNIE WAKEFIELD, RANDI WEINGARTEN (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Siller, Margaret) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/11/2019) (ztd). (Attachment 2 replaced on 7/11/2019) (ztd).
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ELISABETH DEVOS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6246149) filed by DEBORAH BAKER, CYNTHIA MILLER, JANELLE MENZEL, GLORIA NOLAN, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF TEACHERS, AFL-CIO, KELLY FINLAW, RANDI WEINGARTEN, CRYSTAL ADAMS, MICHAEL GIAMBONA, CONNIE WAKEFIELD. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Siller, Margaret)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WEINGARTEN et al v. DEVOS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CYNTHIA MILLER
Represented By: Margaret Marie Siller
Represented By: Faith E. Gay
Represented By: Yelena Konanova
Represented By: Maria Ginzburg
Represented By: Caitlin Halligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CONNIE WAKEFIELD
Represented By: Margaret Marie Siller
Represented By: Faith E. Gay
Represented By: Yelena Konanova
Represented By: Maria Ginzburg
Represented By: Caitlin Halligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEBORAH BAKER
Represented By: Margaret Marie Siller
Represented By: Faith E. Gay
Represented By: Yelena Konanova
Represented By: Maria Ginzburg
Represented By: Caitlin Halligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KELLY FINLAW
Represented By: Margaret Marie Siller
Represented By: Faith E. Gay
Represented By: Yelena Konanova
Represented By: Maria Ginzburg
Represented By: Caitlin Halligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RANDI WEINGARTEN
Represented By: Daniel A. Zibel
Represented By: Margaret Marie Siller
Represented By: Robyn K. Bitner
Represented By: Faith E. Gay
Represented By: Mark H. Richard
Represented By: Yelena Konanova
Represented By: Aaron S. Ament
Represented By: Maria Ginzburg
Represented By: Caitlin Halligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANELLE MENZEL
Represented By: Margaret Marie Siller
Represented By: Faith E. Gay
Represented By: Yelena Konanova
Represented By: Maria Ginzburg
Represented By: Caitlin Halligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMERICAN FEDERATION OF TEACHERS, AFL-CIO
Represented By: Daniel A. Zibel
Represented By: Margaret Marie Siller
Represented By: Robyn K. Bitner
Represented By: Faith E. Gay
Represented By: Mark H. Richard
Represented By: Yelena Konanova
Represented By: Aaron S. Ament
Represented By: Maria Ginzburg
Represented By: Caitlin Halligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL GIAMBONA
Represented By: Margaret Marie Siller
Represented By: Faith E. Gay
Represented By: Yelena Konanova
Represented By: Maria Ginzburg
Represented By: Caitlin Halligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CRYSTAL ADAMS
Represented By: Margaret Marie Siller
Represented By: Faith E. Gay
Represented By: Yelena Konanova
Represented By: Maria Ginzburg
Represented By: Caitlin Halligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GLORIA NOLAN
Represented By: Margaret Marie Siller
Represented By: Faith E. Gay
Represented By: Yelena Konanova
Represented By: Maria Ginzburg
Represented By: Caitlin Halligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELISABETH DEVOS
Represented By: Jonathan D. Kossak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
Represented By: Jonathan D. Kossak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?