LONG v. MOTION PICTURE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA
Plaintiff: CHONTE LONG
Defendant: MOTION PICTURE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA DBA MPAA and MOTION PICTURE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2019cv02088
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Christopher R Cooper
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney Sharon T. Rogart. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 9/9/19. (lccrc2) Modified on 9/12/2019 (lsj).
September 6, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Sharon T. Rogart, :Firm- Heller, Huron, Chertkof & Salzman, PLLC, :Address- 1730 M Street NW, Ste 412, Washington, DC 20036. Phone No. - 202-293-8090. Fax No. - 202-293-7110 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6362824. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CHONTE LONG (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Chertkof, Stephen)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: Upon consideration of the Parties' Joint Rule 16.3 Meet and Confer Statement, it is hereby ORDERED that discovery in this case shall proceed according to the following schedule: Discovery commences August 23, 2019; Motion to Add Parties or Amend Pleadings by October 21, 2019; Proponent's Rule 26(a)(2) Statements by December 20, 2019; Opponent's Rule 26(a)(2) Statements by January 21, 2020; Close of Discovery on February 19, 2020; Post-Discovery Status Conference on February 26, 2020 in Courtroom 27A at 10:00 AM (SEE FULL ORDER FOR DETAILS). Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 8/23/19. (lccrc2)
August 22, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Christopher R. Cooper: Initial Scheduling Conference held on 8/22/2019. Scheduling Order forthcoming. (Court Reporter Lisa Moreira) (znbn)
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Giraudo, Denise)
July 22, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 8/22/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 before Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (lsj)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER setting Initial Scheduling Conference for August 22, 2019 at 10 a.m. in Courtroom 27A. See full Order for details. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 7/22/2019. (lccrc2)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jenna N. Mennona on behalf of MOTION PICTURE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA (Mennona, Jenna)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by MOTION PICTURE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA.(Giraudo, Denise)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal, (zsb)
July 16, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zsb)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of District of Columbia, case number 2019 CA 003875 Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0090-6253288 filed by MOTION PICTURE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA DBA MPAA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Giraudo, Denise)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LONG v. MOTION PICTURE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOTION PICTURE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA DBA MPAA
Represented By: Denise Elizabeth Giraudo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOTION PICTURE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA
Represented By: Denise Elizabeth Giraudo
Represented By: Jenna N. Mennona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHONTE LONG
Represented By: Sharon Tara Rogart
Represented By: Stephen Chertkof
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?