EVANS v. ARAMARK SPORTS AND ENTERTAINMENT SERVICES, LLC
Plaintiff: CORDELIA EVANS and CORDELIA CLOUTTERBUCK
Defendant: ARAMARK SPORTS AND ENTERTAINMENT SERVICES, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv02092
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Robin M Meriweather
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Case randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather for all purposes, including trial. Judge Tanya S. Chutkan is no longer assigned to the case. (zad)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: The court having been advised by the parties in their Meet and Confer Statement [ 7] that they agree to proceed before a Magistrate Judge for all purposes, this matter is hereby REFERRED to a Magistrate Judge for all purposes, including trial. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 8/27/19. (DJS)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Granting in part and denying in part #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Benjamin Douglas may be heard in open court on behalf of Plaintiff, but may not file papers in this court. See Local Civil Rule 83.2(c)(2) ("An attorney who engages in the practice of law from an office located in the District of Columbia must be a member of the District of Columbia Bar AND the Bar of this Court to file papers in this Court."). Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 8/26/19. (DJS)
August 9, 2019 Filing 7 MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Scanlon, Robert)
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jerry David Spitz on behalf of CORDELIA EVANS (Spitz, Jerry)
August 1, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Benjamin Douglas, :Firm- Ashcraft & Gerel, :Address- 1825 K Street, NW, Suite 700, Washington, DC 20006. Phone No. - 2027836400. Fax No. - 2924166382 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6295028. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CORDELIA EVANS (Spitz, Jerry)
July 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal, (zeg)
July 18, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zeg)
July 18, 2019 Filing 3 ERRATA by ARAMARK SPORTS AND ENTERTAINMENT SERVICES, LLC #1 Notice of Removal, filed by ARAMARK SPORTS AND ENTERTAINMENT SERVICES, LLC. (Scanlon, Robert)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ARAMARK SPORTS AND ENTERTAINMENT SERVICES, LLC (Scanlon, Robert)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court for the District of Columbia, case number 2019 CA 003796 B Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0090-6253882 filed by ARAMARK SPORTS AND ENTERTAINMENT SERVICES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Documents from Superior Court, #2 Exhibit Notice to Superior Court, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Scanlon, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EVANS v. ARAMARK SPORTS AND ENTERTAINMENT SERVICES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CORDELIA EVANS
Represented By: Benjamin Douglas
Represented By: Jerry David Spitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CORDELIA CLOUTTERBUCK
Represented By: Benjamin Douglas
Represented By: Jerry David Spitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARAMARK SPORTS AND ENTERTAINMENT SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: Robert Patrick Scanlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?