PREMIUM SPORTS, INC v. LUONGO et al
Plaintiff: PREMIUM SPORTS, INC
Defendant: TODD FREDERICK LUONGO, MYTHOLOGY LLC and DIRTY WATER
Case Number: 1:2019cv02111
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: James E Boasberg
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Per Plaintiff's #6 Notice, the Court ORDERS that the case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/23/2019. (lcjeb3)
July 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by PREMIUM SPORTS, INC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chuzi, George)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that Plaintiff's #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of JULIE COHEN LONSTEIN is GRANTED. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/19/2019. (lcjeb3)
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Julie Cohen Lonstein, :Firm- Lonstein Law Office, PC, :Address- 190 S. Main Street, PO Box 351 Ellenville, NY 12428. Phone No. - (845) 647-8500. Fax No. - (845) 647-6277 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6265033. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by PREMIUM SPORTS, INC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Lonstein Admission List, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Chuzi, George)
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PREMIUM SPORTS, INC (Chuzi, George)
July 18, 2019 Filing 3 REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright.. (Chuzi, George)
July 18, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to TODD FREDERICK LUONGO, MYTHOLOGY LLC. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zeg)
July 18, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zeg)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6257058) filed by PREMIUM SPORTS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Chuzi, George)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PREMIUM SPORTS, INC v. LUONGO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PREMIUM SPORTS, INC
Represented By: George Michael Chuzi
Represented By: Julie Cohen Lonstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TODD FREDERICK LUONGO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYTHOLOGY LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIRTY WATER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?