CAPITAL AREA IMMIGRANTS' RIGHTS COALITION et al v. TRUMP et al Featured Case

Two immigrant rights groups filed this lawsuit (and other groups filed another similar one in the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California) against the Trump administration for its new rule that would significantly restrict the ability of asylum seekers to enter the United States. The rule requires would-be asylum seekers to apply for asylum in a third country through which they traveled to reach the United States before they are eligible to apply to enter the U.S. southern border. The lawsuit alleges that the rule violates the Administrative Procedure Act as well as federal statutes implementing international law.

Plaintiff: CAPITAL AREA IMMIGRANTS' RIGHTS COALITION, REFUGEE AND IMMIGRANT CENTER FOR EDUCATION AND LEGAL SERVICES, INC., HUMAN RIGHTS FIRST, K.M.V.M., N.G.R.L., M.Y.R.B., C.C.R.O., W.M.R.O., J.M.M., D.L.R., Y.G.C. and Z.B.M.
Defendant: U.S. CITIZENSHIP & IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR IMMIGRATION REVIEW, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, U.S. CUSTOMS & BORDER PROTECTION, KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, WILLIAM P. BARR, MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, JOHN P. SANDERS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, JAMES MCHENRY, DONALD J. TRUMP and KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, II
Petitioner: KIDS IN NEED OF DEFENSE (KIND) and PROFESSORS OF IMMIGRATION LAW
Amicus Curiae: IMMIGRATION REFORM LAW INSTITUTE
Case Number: 1:2019cv02117
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 05:0706
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 67 Motion to Withdraw. It is hereby ORDERED that attorney Kaitlin Welborn is withdrawn as counsel of record for Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 4/24/2020. (lctjk1)
April 24, 2020 Filing 67 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Kaitlin Welborn by C.C.R.O., CAPITAL AREA IMMIGRANTS' RIGHTS COALITION, D.L.R., HUMAN RIGHTS FIRST, J.M.M., K.M.V.M., M.Y.R.B., N.G.R.L., REFUGEE AND IMMIGRANT CENTER FOR EDUCATION AND LEGAL SERVICES, INC., W.M.R.O., Y.G.C., Z.B.M. (Welborn, Kaitlin)
April 8, 2020 Filing 66 RESPONSE re 63 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY, filed by MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, WILLIAM P. BARR, KENNETH THOMAS CUCCINELLI, II, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR IMMIGRATION REVIEW, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, JAMES MCHENRY, JOHN P. SANDERS, DONALD J. TRUMP, U.S. CITIZENSHIP & IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS & BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Bingham, Lauren)
March 24, 2020 Filing 65 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order,, Set Deadlines, filed by C.C.R.O., CAPITAL AREA IMMIGRANTS' RIGHTS COALITION, D.L.R., HUMAN RIGHTS FIRST, J.M.M., K.M.V.M., M.Y.R.B., N.G.R.L., REFUGEE AND IMMIGRANT CENTER FOR EDUCATION AND LEGAL SERVICES, INC., W.M.R.O., Y.G.C., Z.B.M.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Bernick, Justin)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendants' 64 Notice of Upcoming Removal, if Plaintiff J.M.M. intends to file a response to the Notice, Plaintiff J.M.M. shall do so by March 24, 2020, at 5:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 3/23/2020. (lctjk1)
March 20, 2020 Filing 64 NOTICE of Upcoming Removal by MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, WILLIAM P. BARR, KENNETH THOMAS CUCCINELLI, II, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR IMMIGRATION REVIEW (Bingham, Lauren)
March 5, 2020 Filing 63 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by C.C.R.O., CAPITAL AREA IMMIGRANTS' RIGHTS COALITION, D.L.R., HUMAN RIGHTS FIRST, J.M.M., K.M.V.M., M.Y.R.B., N.G.R.L., REFUGEE AND IMMIGRANT CENTER FOR EDUCATION AND LEGAL SERVICES, INC., W.M.R.O., Y.G.C., Z.B.M. (Bernick, Justin)
January 28, 2020 Filing 62 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Timothy J. Kelly held on November 7, 2019; Page Numbers: 1-89. Date of Issuance:January 28, 2020. Court Reporter/Transcriber Timothy R. Miller, RPR, CRR, NJ-CCR, Telephone number (202) 354-3111, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased fro m the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 2/18/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/28/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/27/2020.(ztnr)
January 2, 2020 Filing 61 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to C.C.R.O., CAPITAL AREA IMMIGRANTS' RIGHTS COALITION, D.L.R., HUMAN RIGHTS FIRST, J.M.M., K.M.V.M., M.Y.R.B., N.G.R.L., REFUGEE AND IMMIGRANT CENTER FOR EDUCATION AND LEGAL SERVICES, INC., W.M.R.O., Y.G.C., Z.B.M.. Attorney Elizabeth Hagerty terminated. (Hagerty, Elizabeth)
November 15, 2019 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas P. Schmidt on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Schmidt, Thomas)
November 7, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Timothy J. Kelly: Motion Hearing held on 11/7/2019 re #41 cross motions for Summary Judgment. Oral argument heard and taken under advisement. (Court Reporter: Timothy Miller) (zkh)
October 28, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: The Motion Hearing currently set for 11/4/2019 is RESCHEDULED for 11/7/2019 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zkh)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The hearing on the parties' cross-motions for summary judgment scheduled for October 28, 2019, at 2:00 PM is hereby CONTINUED to November 4, 2019, at 2:00 PM. Should the parties have a scheduling conflict, they shall jointly contact the Courtroom Deputy as soon as practicable to reschedule to a mutually agreeable date and time. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 10/24/19. (lctjk2)
October 23, 2019 Filing 59 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to Support Summary Judgment filed by C.C.R.O., CAPITAL AREA IMMIGRANTS' RIGHTS COALITION, D.L.R., HUMAN RIGHTS FIRST, J.M.M., K.M.V.M., M.Y.R.B., N.G.R.L., REFUGEE AND IMMIGRANT CENTER FOR EDUCATION AND LEGAL SERVICES, INC., W.M.R.O., Y.G.C., Z.B.M.. (Bernick, Justin)
October 16, 2019 Filing 58 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to support motion for summary judgment filed by MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, WILLIAM P. BARR, KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, II, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR IMMIGRATION REVIEW, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, JAMES MCHENRY, JOHN P. SANDERS, DONALD J. TRUMP, U.S. CITIZENSHIP & IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS & BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Reuveni, Erez)
October 11, 2019 Filing 57 RESPONSE re #55 Supplemental Memorandum, (Civil Statement) filed by C.C.R.O., CAPITAL AREA IMMIGRANTS' RIGHTS COALITION, D.L.R., HUMAN RIGHTS FIRST, J.M.M., K.M.V.M., M.Y.R.B., N.G.R.L., REFUGEE AND IMMIGRANT CENTER FOR EDUCATION AND LEGAL SERVICES, INC., W.M.R.O., Y.G.C., Z.B.M.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kaitlin Welborn, #2 Declaration of Prajakta Sonalker, #3 Certificate of Service)(Hagerty, Elizabeth)
October 11, 2019 Filing 56 RESPONSE re #53 Civil Statement filed by MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, WILLIAM P. BARR, KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, II, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR IMMIGRATION REVIEW, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, JAMES MCHENRY, JOHN P. SANDERS, DONALD J. TRUMP, U.S. CITIZENSHIP & IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS & BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Reuveni, Erez)
October 3, 2019 Filing 55 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re #52 Civil Statement, (corrected) filed by MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, WILLIAM P. BARR, KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, II, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR IMMIGRATION REVIEW, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, JAMES MCHENRY, JOHN P. SANDERS, DONALD J. TRUMP, U.S. CITIZENSHIP & IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS & BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Reuveni, Erez)
October 3, 2019 Filing 54 NOTICE of correction and mootness by MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, WILLIAM P. BARR, KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, II, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR IMMIGRATION REVIEW, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, JAMES MCHENRY, JOHN P. SANDERS, DONALD J. TRUMP, U.S. CITIZENSHIP & IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS & BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Reuveni, Erez)
September 30, 2019 Filing 53 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM re #41 Statement of Undisputed Material Facts from Plaintiffs. (Bernick, Justin) Modified event title and link on 10/3/2019 (znmw).
September 30, 2019 Filing 52 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM re #41 Statement of Undisputed Material Facts from Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Elizabeth Burgus, #2 Exhibit N.B. Redacted Interview Notice)(Bingham, Lauren) Modified event title and link on 10/3/2019 (znmw).
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' #50 Joint Statement on Scheduling, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties' briefs concerning Plaintiffs' #41 Motion for Preliminary Injunction shall be treated as cross-motions for summary judgment. The following schedule shall govern further proceedings as to those cross-motions: (1) each party shall file a statement of undisputed material facts by September 30, 2019; (2) each party shall file a response to the opposing party's statement of undisputed material facts by October 11, 2019; (3) Defendants shall file their consolidated supplemental brief by October 16, 2019; (4) Plaintiffs shall file their supplemental brief by October 23, 2019; and (5) the parties shall appear for a hearing on their cross-motions for summary judgment on October 28, 2019, at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 11. Upon the parties' joint request, and because Defendants intend to raise threshold jurisdictional issues in their supplemental briefing, it is further ORDERED that Defendants' deadline to answer the #37 Amended Complaint is STAYED pending further order of the Court. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 9/18/2019. (lctjk2)
September 17, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Defendants. Case related to Case No. 19-cv-2773. (Reuveni, Erez) (Main Document 51 replaced on 9/18/2019) (znmw).
September 16, 2019 Filing 50 PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE by C.C.R.O., CAPITAL AREA IMMIGRANTS' RIGHTS COALITION, D.L.R., HUMAN RIGHTS FIRST, J.M.M., K.M.V.M., M.Y.R.B., N.G.R.L., REFUGEE AND IMMIGRANT CENTER FOR EDUCATION AND LEGAL SERVICES, INC., W.M.R.O., Y.G.C., Z.B.M.. (Bernick, Justin)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the deadline to submit a joint proposed schedule concerning cross-motions for summary judgment is EXTENDED to September 16, 2019. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 9/13/2019. (lctjk2)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' #49 Joint Statement on Scheduling Concerning Plaintiffs' Motions for Preliminary Injunction, and in light of the renewed injunction issued by the District Court for the Northern District of California in East Bay Sanctuary Covenant et al. v. Barr et al., Case No. 19-cv-04073-JST, ECF No. 73, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs' #41 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is held in abeyance, and the hearing on that motion scheduled for September 11, 2019, is VACATED. Plaintiffs are entitled to renew their motion if that injunction is stayed or vacated in whole or in part. It is further ORDERED that within two days of the Supreme Court's decision on the application for a stay pending appeal in Barr et al. v. East Bay Sanctuary Covenant et al., No. 19A230, the parties shall promptly confer and propose a schedule concerning cross-motions for summary judgment. In light of this order, the telephonic status conference scheduled for September 10, 2019, is hereby VACATED. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 9/9/2019. (lctjk2)
September 9, 2019 Filing 49 PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE by C.C.R.O., CAPITAL AREA IMMIGRANTS' RIGHTS COALITION, D.L.R., HUMAN RIGHTS FIRST, J.M.M., K.M.V.M., M.Y.R.B., N.G.R.L., REFUGEE AND IMMIGRANT CENTER FOR EDUCATION AND LEGAL SERVICES, INC., W.M.R.O., Y.G.C., Z.B.M.. (Bernick, Justin)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a telephonic status conference on September 10, 2019, at 9:00 a.m. The parties shall confer in light of the District Court for the Northern District of California's order reinstating the scope of injunctive relief in East Bay Sanctuary Covenant et al. v. Barr et al., Case No. 19-cv-04073-JST, ECF No. 73, and be prepared to discuss how they would like to proceed in this case. The parties shall promptly contact the Courtroom Deputy at (202) 354-3495 to make arrangements to do so. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 9/9/2019. (lctjk2)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Consistent with the structure of the hearing on Plaintiffs' motion for a temporary restraining order, the Court plans to ask the parties a set of prepared questions at the consolidated hearing scheduled for September 11, 2019, on Plaintiffs' #41 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and the plaintiffs' comparable motion in the related case, I.A. et al. v. Barr et al., Civil Action No. 19-2530. Accordingly, and in light of the numerous common issues presented by the cases, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall confer with the plaintiffs in the related case to discuss a mutually agreeable plan for responding to the Court's questioning on those common issues. The Court will not tolerate duplicative arguments from both sets of plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 9/9/2019. (lctjk2)
September 5, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig Alan Hoover on behalf of C.C.R.O., CAPITAL AREA IMMIGRANTS' RIGHTS COALITION, D.L.R., HUMAN RIGHTS FIRST, J.M.M., K.M.V.M., M.Y.R.B., N.G.R.L., REFUGEE AND IMMIGRANT CENTER FOR EDUCATION AND LEGAL SERVICES, INC., W.M.R.O., Y.G.C., Z.B.M. (Hoover, Craig)
September 4, 2019 Filing 47 SEALED DOCUMENT (Exhibit A) filed by MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, WILLIAM P. BARR, KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR IMMIGRATION REVIEW, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, JAMES MCHENRY, JOHN P. SANDERS, DONALD J. TRUMP, U.S. CITIZENSHIP & IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS & BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. re #43 Response to motion,, filed by U.S. CUSTOMS & BORDER PROTECTION, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, U.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, DONALD J. TRUMP, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR IMMIGRATION REVIEW, JOHN P. SANDERS, U.S. CITIZENSHIP & IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, WILLIAM P. BARR, JAMES MCHENRY. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit E, #5 Exhibit F, #6 Exhibit G, #7 Exhibit H, #8 Exhibit I, #9 Exhibit J, #10 Exhibit K, #11 Exhibit L, #12 Exhibit M, #13 Exhibit N, #14 Exhibit N) (ztth)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Defendants' #44 Unopposed Motion to File Exhibits Under Seal. In light of the Court's #36 Memorandum Opinion & Order and Defendants' obligations under 8 C.F.R. 208.6, and upon consideration of the relevant factors set forth in United States v. Hubbard, 650 F.2d 293, 317-22 (D.C. Cir. 1980), including the fact that no party objects, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants' motion is GRANTED. Exhibits A through O, attached to the motion as ECF No. 44-1 through ECF No. 44-15, the last of which the Court presumes is incorrectly marked Exhibit N, shall remain under seal. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 9/4/2019. (lctjk2)
September 3, 2019 Filing 46 REPLY to opposition to motion re #41 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by C.C.R.O., CAPITAL AREA IMMIGRANTS' RIGHTS COALITION, D.L.R., HUMAN RIGHTS FIRST, J.M.M., K.M.V.M., M.Y.R.B., N.G.R.L., REFUGEE AND IMMIGRANT CENTER FOR EDUCATION AND LEGAL SERVICES, INC., W.M.R.O., Y.G.C., Z.B.M.. (Bernick, Justin)
August 29, 2019 Filing 45 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants as Amicus Curiae by IMMIGRATION REFORM LAW INSTITUTE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amicus Memo of Law, #2 Exhibit Exhibit to Proposed Memo, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Joseph, Lawrence)
August 28, 2019 Filing 44 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, WILLIAM P. BARR, KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR IMMIGRATION REVIEW, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, JAMES MCHENRY, JOHN P. SANDERS, DONALD J. TRUMP, U.S. CITIZENSHIP & IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS & BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit)(Bingham, Lauren)
August 28, 2019 Filing 43 RESPONSE re #41 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, WILLIAM P. BARR, KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR IMMIGRATION REVIEW, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, JAMES MCHENRY, JOHN P. SANDERS, DONALD J. TRUMP, U.S. CITIZENSHIP & IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS & BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit)(Bingham, Lauren)
August 28, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION for Leave to File a Brief as Amicus Curiae by Professors of Immigration Law (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amicus Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lamb, Kevin)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' #40 Joint Statement, it is hereby ORDERED that the following schedule shall govern further proceedings: (1) Defendants shall file their opposition to Plaintiffs' #41 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by August 28, 2019; (2) Plaintiffs shall file their reply by September 3, 2019; and (3) the parties shall appear for a hearing on Plaintiffs' motion on September 11, 2019, at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 11. The parties may, where feasible, incorporate by reference any arguments made in their briefing on Plaintiffs' motion for a temporary restraining order. Furthermore, Defendants are permitted to file a consolidated memorandum in opposition addressing both Plaintiffs' motion in this case and the plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction in the related case, I.A. et al. v. Barr et al., Civil Action No. 19-2530, provided that Defendants file the memorandum on both dockets. It is further ORDERED that, upon the parties' request, the briefing schedule entered by the Court on July 30, 2019, concerning the parties' cross-motions for summary judgment is hereby held in abeyance pending resolution of Plaintiffs' renewed motion for a preliminary injunction. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 8/22/2019. (lctjk2)
August 21, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by C.C.R.O., CAPITAL AREA IMMIGRANTS' RIGHTS COALITION, D.L.R., HUMAN RIGHTS FIRST, J.M.M., K.M.V.M., M.Y.R.B., N.G.R.L., REFUGEE AND IMMIGRANT CENTER FOR EDUCATION AND LEGAL SERVICES, INC., W.M.R.O., Y.G.C., Z.B.M. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration (Supplemental) of Claudia Cubas, #3 Declaration (Supplemental) of Michelle Garza Pareja, #4 Declaration of Sharon McBride, #5 Declaration of Lisa Frydman, #6 Text of Proposed Order, #7 Certificate of Service)(Bernick, Justin)
August 20, 2019 Filing 40 PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE re Order,,,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,, by C.C.R.O., CAPITAL AREA IMMIGRANTS' RIGHTS COALITION, D.L.R., HUMAN RIGHTS FIRST, J.M.M., K.M.V.M., M.Y.R.B., N.G.R.L., REFUGEE AND IMMIGRANT CENTER FOR EDUCATION AND LEGAL SERVICES, INC., W.M.R.O., Y.G.C., Z.B.M.. (Bernick, Justin)
August 20, 2019 Filing 39 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. MATTHEW T. ALBENCE served on 7/22/2019; WILLIAM P. BARR served on 7/23/2019; KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI served on 7/22/2019; EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR IMMIGRATION REVIEW served on 7/22/2019; KEVIN K. MCALEENAN served on 7/22/2019; JAMES MCHENRY served on 7/22/2019; JOHN P. SANDERS served on 7/22/2019; DONALD J. TRUMP served on 7/25/2019; U.S. CITIZENSHIP & IMMIGRATION SERVICES served on 7/22/2019; U.S. CUSTOMS & BORDER PROTECTION served on 7/22/2019; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 7/22/2019; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 7/23/2019; U.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT served on 7/23/2019 (Hagerty, Elizabeth)
August 18, 2019 Filing 38 MEMORANDUM re #31 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by CAPITAL AREA IMMIGRANTS' RIGHTS COALITION, REFUGEE AND IMMIGRANT CENTER FOR EDUCATION AND LEGAL SERVICES, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) filed by REFUGEE AND IMMIGRANT CENTER FOR EDUCATION AND LEGAL SERVICES, INC., CAPITAL AREA IMMIGRANTS' RIGHTS COALITION by C.C.R.O., CAPITAL AREA IMMIGRANTS' RIGHTS COALITION, D.L.R., Human Rights First, J.M.M., K.M.V.M., M.Y.R.B., N.G.R.L., REFUGEE AND IMMIGRANT CENTER FOR EDUCATION AND LEGAL SERVICES, INC., W.M.R.O., Y.G.C., Z.B.M.. (Hagerty, Elizabeth)
August 18, 2019 Filing 37 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by REFUGEE AND IMMIGRANT CENTER FOR EDUCATION AND LEGAL SERVICES, INC., CAPITAL AREA IMMIGRANTS' RIGHTS COALITION, Z.B.M., C.C.R.O., Y.G.C., D.L.R., M.Y.R.B., N.G.R.L., Human Rights First, W.M.R.O., J.M.M., K.M.V.M..(Hagerty, Elizabeth)
August 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #31 Motion for Leave to File Using Pseudonyms and Under Seal. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 8/18/2019. (lctjk2)
August 16, 2019 Filing 35 RESPONSE re #31 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by CAPITAL AREA IMMIGRANTS' RIGHTS COALITION, REFUGEE AND IMMIGRANT CENTER FOR EDUCATION AND LEGAL SERVICES, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) filed by CAPITAL AREA IMMIGRANTS' RIGHTS COALITION, REFUGEE AND IMMIGRANT CENTER FOR EDUCATION AND LEGAL SERVICES, INC.. (Bernick, Justin)
August 12, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Hardy Vieux on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Vieux, Hardy)
August 12, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia Stottlemyer on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Stottlemyer, Patricia)
August 9, 2019 Filing 32 TRANSCRIPT OF TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER HEARING before Judge Timothy J. Kelly held on 7-22-19; Page Numbers: 1-156; Date of Issuance: 8-9-19; Court Reporter: Timothy R. Miller, Telephone Number (202) 354-3111. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <

<

<

<

<

< Redaction Request due 8/30/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/9/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/7/2019.(Miller, Timothy)
August 6, 2019 Filing 31 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by CAPITAL AREA IMMIGRANTS' RIGHTS COALITION, REFUGEE AND IMMIGRANT CENTER FOR EDUCATION AND LEGAL SERVICES, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Amended Complaint, #3 Declaration of J.M.M., #4 Declaration of D.L.R., #5 Declaration of Z.B.M., #6 Declaration of Y.C.G., #7 Declaration of M.Y.R.B., #8 Declaration of K.M.V.M., #9 Declaration of W.M.R.O., #10 Declaration of C.C.R.O., #11 Declaration of N.G.R.L., #12 Text of Proposed Order, #13 Certificate of Service)(Bernick, Justin)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' #30 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the following schedule shall govern further proceedings: (1) Plaintiffs shall file their motion for summary judgment by August 27, 2019; (2) Defendants shall file their consolidated cross-motion for summary judgment and opposition to Plaintiffs' motion by September 17, 2019; (3) Plaintiffs shall file their consolidated reply in support of their motion and opposition to Defendants' cross-motion by September 24, 2019; (4) and Defendants shall file their reply in support of their cross-motion by October 1, 2019. The parties shall appear for a hearing on their motions on October 16, 2019, at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 11. Upon consent of the parties, the Court shall hold Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction in abeyance in light of the preliminary injunction entered by the District Court for the Northern District of California in East Bay Sanctuary Covenant v. Barr, Case No. 19-cv-4073-JST, ECF No. 42. Plaintiffs are, of course, entitled to renew their motion if that injunction is stayed or vacated in whole or in part. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 7/30/2019. (lctjk2)
July 29, 2019 Filing 30 Joint STATUS REPORT by CAPITAL AREA IMMIGRANTS' RIGHTS COALITION, REFUGEE AND IMMIGRANT CENTER FOR EDUCATION AND LEGAL SERVICES, INC.. (Bernick, Justin)
July 29, 2019 Filing 29 RESPONSE re #19 MOTION for Leave to File A Brief Amicus Curiae filed by MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, WILLIAM P. BARR, KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR IMMIGRATION REVIEW, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, JAMES MCHENRY, JOHN P. SANDERS, DONALD J. TRUMP, U.S. CITIZENSHIP & IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS & BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Reuveni, Erez)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Despite the Court's instruction at the oral ruling held on July 24, 2019, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and file a joint status report no later than Monday, July 29, 2019, proposing how they would like to proceed in this matter. That report shall address, in particular, whether the Government, if it has not already done so, intends to seek a stay of the District Court for the Northern District of California's order entering a preliminary injunction in Case No. 19-cv-04073-JST, ECF No. 42, and further whether, in light of that order, the parties in this case will consent to holding Plaintiffs' #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction in abeyance and proceed to summary judgment briefing on Plaintiffs' claims. It is further ORDERED that Defendants shall file their response to Movant KIND's #19 Motion for Leave to File an Amicus Brief by Monday, July 29, 2019. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 7/25/2019. (lctjk2)
July 24, 2019 Filing 28 TRANSCRIPT OF ORAL RULING before Judge Timothy J. Kelly held on 7-24-19; Page Numbers: 1-16; Date of Issuance: 7-24-19; Court Reporter: Timothy R. Miller, Telephone Number (202) 354-3111. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <

<

<

<

<

< Redaction Request due 8/14/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/24/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/22/2019.(Miller, Timothy)
July 24, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Timothy J. Kelly: Oral Ruling held on 7/24/2019. For the reasons stated on the record in open court, Plaintiff's #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order is DENIED. (Court Reporter: Timothy Miller) (kh)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall appear for an oral ruling on Plaintiffs' #3 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order on July 24, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 11. If counsel wish to appear telephonically, they shall contact the Courtroom Deputy at (202) 354-3495 to make arrangements to do so. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 7/23/2019. (lctjk2)
July 23, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Crowell Bingham on behalf of MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, WILLIAM P. BARR, KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR IMMIGRATION REVIEW, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, JAMES MCHENRY, JOHN P. SANDERS, DONALD J. TRUMP, U.S. CITIZENSHIP & IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS & BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Bingham, Lauren)
July 22, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Manoj Govindaiah on behalf of REFUGEE AND IMMIGRANT CENTER FOR EDUCATION AND LEGAL SERVICES, INC. (Govindaiah, Manoj)
July 22, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Neal Kumar Katyal on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Katyal, Neal)
July 22, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by T. Clark Weymouth on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Weymouth, T.)
July 22, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Timothy J. Kelly: Motion Hearing held on 7/22/2019 re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Oral argument heard and taken under advisement. (Court Reporter: Timothy Miller) (kh)
July 22, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Kaitlin Welborn on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Welborn, Kaitlin)
July 21, 2019 Filing 22 REPLY to opposition to motion re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by CAPITAL AREA IMMIGRANTS' RIGHTS COALITION, REFUGEE AND IMMIGRANT CENTER FOR EDUCATION AND LEGAL SERVICES, INC.. (Bernick, Justin)
July 20, 2019 Filing 21 ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, WILLIAM P. BARR, KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR IMMIGRATION REVIEW, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, JAMES MCHENRY, JOHN P. SANDERS, DONALD J. TRUMP, U.S. CITIZENSHIP & IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS & BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: #1 Administrative Record Part 1, #2 Administrative Record Part 2, #3 Administrative Record Part 3, #4 Administrative Record Part 4, #5 Administrative Record Part 5, #6 Administrative Record Part 6, #7 Administrative Record Part 7, #8 Administrative Record Part 8, #9 Administrative Record Part 9)(Reuveni, Erez)
July 20, 2019 Filing 20 Memorandum in opposition to re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, WILLIAM P. BARR, KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR IMMIGRATION REVIEW, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, JAMES MCHENRY, JOHN P. SANDERS, DONALD J. TRUMP, U.S. CITIZENSHIP & IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS & BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reuveni, Erez)
July 19, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to File A Brief Amicus Curiae by KIDS IN NEED OF DEFENSE (KIND) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Raffman, Mark)
July 19, 2019 Filing 18 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by REFUGEE AND IMMIGRANT CENTER FOR EDUCATION AND LEGAL SERVICES, INC. (Hagerty, Elizabeth)
July 19, 2019 Filing 17 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CAPITAL AREA IMMIGRANTS' RIGHTS COALITION (Hagerty, Elizabeth)
July 19, 2019 Filing 16 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/19/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/17/2019. (Hagerty, Elizabeth)
July 19, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Grant Stewart on behalf of All Defendants (Stewart, Scott)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: As discussed at the telephonic status conference held today, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall file their opposition to Plaintiffs' #3 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order by July 20, 2019, at 10:00 a.m., and Plaintiffs shall file their reply in support of their motion by July 21, 2019, at 6:00 p.m. The parties shall appear for a hearing on Plaintiffs' motion for a temporary restraining order on July 22, 2019, at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 11. It is further ORDERED that Defendants shall file the administrative record as soon as practicable, and no later than July 23, 2019, at 8:00 p.m. In light of this order, Plaintiffs' #4 Motion for Expedited Hearing is hereby DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 7/18/2019. (lctjk2)
July 18, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Timothy J. Kelly: Telephone Status Conference held on 7/18/2019. Order to be issued by the court. Hearing on #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order set for 7/22/2019 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (Court Reporter: Patricia Kaneshiro-Miller) (kh)
July 18, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS (14) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall appear for a telephonic status conference today, July 18, 2019, at 4:30 p.m. to discuss Plaintiffs' #4 Motion for Expedited Hearing. The parties shall promptly contact the Courtroom Deputy at (202) 354-3495 to make arrangements to do so. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 7/18/2019. (lctjk2)
July 18, 2019 Filing 13 Case randomly reassigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. Judge Christopher R. Cooper is no longer assigned to the case. (rj)
July 18, 2019 Filing 12 Case randomly reassigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. Judge Randolph D. Moss is no longer assigned to the case. (rj)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Local Rule 40.5(a)(3) provides that "[c]ivil, including miscellaneous, cases are deemed related when the earliest is still pending on the merits in the District Court and they (i) relate to common property, or (ii) involve common issues of fact, or (iii) grow out of the same event or transaction or (iv) involve the validity or infringement of the same patent." "The fundamental rationale for the general rule requiring random assignment of cases is to ensure greater public confidence in the integrity of the judicial process. The rule guarantees fair and equal distribution of cases to all judges, avoids public perception or appearance of favoritism in assignments, and reduces opportunities for judge-shopping." Tripp v. Executive Office of the President, 196 F.R.D. 201, 202 (D.D.C. 2000) (Calendar Committee three-judge panel). Because the two cases at issue, O.A. et al. v. Trump et al., 18-cv-2718 and CAIR et al. v. Trump et al., 19-cv-2117, involve APA challenges to different interim final rules enacting different policies based on different administrative records, the Court has determined that they are not related for the purposes of Local Rule 40.5(a)(3). That the cases may involve some overlapping legal issues and similar factual contentions relating to standing does not change this conclusion. Thus, it is hereby ORDERED that this case shall be randomly reassigned pursuant to Local Rule 40.3(a). Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 7/18/2019. (lcrdm1, )
July 18, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Hagerty on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hagerty, Elizabeth)
July 18, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Mitchell Pearsall Reich on behalf of CAPITAL AREA IMMIGRANTS' RIGHTS COALITION, REFUGEE AND IMMIGRANT CENTER FOR EDUCATION AND LEGAL SERVICES, INC. (Reich, Mitchell)
July 17, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by CAPITAL AREA IMMIGRANTS' RIGHTS COALITION, REFUGEE AND IMMIGRANT CENTER FOR EDUCATION AND LEGAL SERVICES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bernick, Justin)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CAPITAL AREA IMMIGRANTS' RIGHTS COALITION, REFUGEE AND IMMIGRANT CENTER FOR EDUCATION AND LEGAL SERVICES, INC. re #7 Response to Order of the Court . (Bernick, Justin)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re Order,,, filed by CAPITAL AREA IMMIGRANTS' RIGHTS COALITION, REFUGEE AND IMMIGRANT CENTER FOR EDUCATION AND LEGAL SERVICES, INC.. (Bernick, Justin) Modified event title on 7/18/2019 (znmw).
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE re #2 NOTICE of Related Case by MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, WILLIAM P. BARR, KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR IMMIGRATION REVIEW, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, JAMES MCHENRY, JOHN P. SANDERS, DONALD J. TRUMP, U.S. CITIZENSHIP & IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS & BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Reuveni, Erez) Modified event title on 7/18/2019 (znmw).
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Erez Reuveni on behalf of All Defendants (Reuveni, Erez)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: In filing the present action, Plaintiffs indicated that the matter should be designated as related to O.A. et al. v. Trump et al., 18-cv-2718, pursuant to Local Rule 40.5(a)(3). To ensure that the matter is properly assigned, Plaintiffs are hereby ORDERED to show cause before 7:00 p.m. July 17, 2019, why this case should be treated as related to O.A. v. Trump. Defendants may also file a brief before 7:00 p.m. today expressing their views on whether and, if so, why the cases should be treated as related. The Court recognizes that this is a very abbreviated schedule but has concluded that expedition is necessary in light of the pending motion for a temporary restraining order. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 7/17/2019. (lcrdm1, )
July 17, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zsb)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Expedite Hearing by CAPITAL AREA IMMIGRANTS' RIGHTS COALITION, REFUGEE AND IMMIGRANT CENTER FOR EDUCATION AND LEGAL SERVICES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bernick, Justin)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by CAPITAL AREA IMMIGRANTS' RIGHTS COALITION, REFUGEE AND IMMIGRANT CENTER FOR EDUCATION AND LEGAL SERVICES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Michelle Garza Pareja, #3 Declaration of Claudia Cubas, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Declaration of Counsel Regarding Compliance with Local Rule 65.1)(Bernick, Justin). Added MOTION for Preliminary Injunction on 7/18/2019 (znmw).
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 1:18-cv-2718; 1:18-cv-2838. (Bernick, Justin)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6258216) filed by CAPITAL AREA IMMIGRANTS' RIGHTS COALITION, REFUGEE AND IMMIGRANT CENTER FOR EDUCATION AND LEGAL SERVICES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons)(Bernick, Justin)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6258216) filed by CAPITAL AREA IMMIGRANTS' RIGHTS COALITION, REFUGEE AND IMMIGRANT CENTER FOR EDUCATION AND LEGAL SERVICES, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons, # 8 Summons, # 9 Summons, # 10 Summons, # 11 Summons, # 12 Summons, # 13 Summons, # 14 Summons, # 15 Summons)(Bernick, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CAPITAL AREA IMMIGRANTS' RIGHTS COALITION et al v. TRUMP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. CITIZENSHIP & IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Represented By: Lauren Crowell Bingham
Represented By: Scott Grant Stewart
Represented By: Erez Reuveni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
Represented By: Lauren Crowell Bingham
Represented By: Scott Grant Stewart
Represented By: Erez Reuveni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR IMMIGRATION REVIEW
Represented By: Lauren Crowell Bingham
Represented By: Scott Grant Stewart
Represented By: Erez Reuveni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Represented By: Lauren Crowell Bingham
Represented By: Scott Grant Stewart
Represented By: Erez Reuveni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN K. MCALEENAN
Represented By: Lauren Crowell Bingham
Represented By: Scott Grant Stewart
Represented By: Erez Reuveni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. CUSTOMS & BORDER PROTECTION
Represented By: Lauren Crowell Bingham
Represented By: Scott Grant Stewart
Represented By: Erez Reuveni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM P. BARR
Represented By: Lauren Crowell Bingham
Represented By: Scott Grant Stewart
Represented By: Erez Reuveni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATTHEW T. ALBENCE
Represented By: Lauren Crowell Bingham
Represented By: Scott Grant Stewart
Represented By: Erez Reuveni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN P. SANDERS
Represented By: Lauren Crowell Bingham
Represented By: Scott Grant Stewart
Represented By: Erez Reuveni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Represented By: Lauren Crowell Bingham
Represented By: Scott Grant Stewart
Represented By: Erez Reuveni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES MCHENRY
Represented By: Lauren Crowell Bingham
Represented By: Scott Grant Stewart
Represented By: Erez Reuveni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONALD J. TRUMP
Represented By: Lauren Crowell Bingham
Represented By: Scott Grant Stewart
Represented By: Erez Reuveni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, II
Represented By: Lauren Crowell Bingham
Represented By: Scott Grant Stewart
Represented By: Erez Reuveni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAPITAL AREA IMMIGRANTS' RIGHTS COALITION
Represented By: Justin Bernick
Represented By: T. Clark Weymouth
Represented By: Patricia Stottlemyer
Represented By: Mitchell Pearsall Reich
Represented By: Hardy Vieux
Represented By: Kaitlin Welborn
Represented By: Elizabeth Hagerty
Represented By: Craig Alan Hoover
Represented By: Neal Kumar Katyal
Represented By: Thomas P. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REFUGEE AND IMMIGRANT CENTER FOR EDUCATION AND LEGAL SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: Justin Bernick
Represented By: T. Clark Weymouth
Represented By: Patricia Stottlemyer
Represented By: Mitchell Pearsall Reich
Represented By: Hardy Vieux
Represented By: Kaitlin Welborn
Represented By: Elizabeth Hagerty
Represented By: Craig Alan Hoover
Represented By: Neal Kumar Katyal
Represented By: Manoj Govindaiah
Represented By: Thomas P. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HUMAN RIGHTS FIRST
Represented By: Elizabeth Hagerty
Represented By: Justin Bernick
Represented By: Craig Alan Hoover
Represented By: Thomas P. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K.M.V.M.
Represented By: Elizabeth Hagerty
Represented By: Justin Bernick
Represented By: Craig Alan Hoover
Represented By: Thomas P. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N.G.R.L.
Represented By: Elizabeth Hagerty
Represented By: Justin Bernick
Represented By: Craig Alan Hoover
Represented By: Thomas P. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.Y.R.B.
Represented By: Elizabeth Hagerty
Represented By: Justin Bernick
Represented By: Craig Alan Hoover
Represented By: Thomas P. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.C.R.O.
Represented By: Elizabeth Hagerty
Represented By: Justin Bernick
Represented By: Craig Alan Hoover
Represented By: Thomas P. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: W.M.R.O.
Represented By: Elizabeth Hagerty
Represented By: Justin Bernick
Represented By: Craig Alan Hoover
Represented By: Thomas P. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.M.M.
Represented By: Elizabeth Hagerty
Represented By: Justin Bernick
Represented By: Craig Alan Hoover
Represented By: Thomas P. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D.L.R.
Represented By: Elizabeth Hagerty
Represented By: Justin Bernick
Represented By: Craig Alan Hoover
Represented By: Thomas P. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Y.G.C.
Represented By: Elizabeth Hagerty
Represented By: Justin Bernick
Represented By: Craig Alan Hoover
Represented By: Thomas P. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Z.B.M.
Represented By: Elizabeth Hagerty
Represented By: Justin Bernick
Represented By: Craig Alan Hoover
Represented By: Thomas P. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: KIDS IN NEED OF DEFENSE (KIND)
Represented By: Mark S. Raffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: PROFESSORS OF IMMIGRATION LAW
Represented By: Kevin Matthew Lamb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: IMMIGRATION REFORM LAW INSTITUTE
Represented By: Lawrence J. Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?