YOUNG v. PERDUE

Plaintiff: Richard V Young and RICHARD V. YOUNG
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE and SONNY PERDUE
Case Number: 1:2019cv02144
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Rudolph Contreras
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/29/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/27/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 07/29/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. SONNY PERDUE served on 7/31/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Brown Gaines, Eden)
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to SONNY PERDUE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zeg)
July 23, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zeg)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6264600) filed by Richard V Young. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Brown Gaines, Eden)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: YOUNG v. PERDUE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SONNY PERDUE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard V Young
Represented By: Eden J. Brown Gaines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD V. YOUNG
Represented By: Eden J. Brown Gaines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?