AVOYELLES HOSPITAL et al v. AZAR
Plaintiff: HOSPITAL EPISCOPAL CRISTO REDENTOR, PROVIDENCE SAINT PETER HOSPITAL, HONORHEALTH DEER VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, PROVIDENCE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER EVERETT COLBY CAMPUS, BAYLOR UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER AT DALLAS, BAYLOR SCOTT & WHITE MEDICAL CENTER-CARROLLTON, BAYLOR SCOTT & WHITE MEDICAL CENTER -WAXAHACHIE, HEALTH FIRST CAPE CANAVERAL HOSPITAL, OAKDALE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, CHI SAINT LUKE'S HEALTH-BAYLOR SAINT LUKE'S MEDICAL CENTER, SAINT LUKE'S EAST HOSPITAL, PROVIDENCE HOLY FAMILY HOSPITAL, SAINT LUKE'S HOSPITAL OF KANSAS CITY, BAYLOR SCOTT & WHITE MEDICAL CENTER TEMPLE, BAYLOR SCOTT & WHITE FORT WORTH, BAYLOR SCOTT & WHITE MEDICAL CENTER - GARLAND, AVOYELLES HOSPITAL, BAYLOR SCOTT & WHITE MEDICAL CENTER IRVING, NOVANT HEALTH ROWAN MEDICAL CENTER, ASANTE ROGUE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, HONORHEALTH JOHN C. LINCOLN MEDICAL CENTER and HOSPITAL SAN LUCAS PONCE
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Case Number: 1:2019cv02177
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Christopher R Cooper
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing of Reply in Support of Motion to Consolidate by ALEX M. AZAR, II (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Reply ISO Motion to Consolidate)(Orloff, Serena)
August 5, 2019 Cases Consolidated. Cases 18cv222 CRC and 19cv2177 CRC have been consolidated pursuant to Minute Order entered 8/5/2019. All future filings in this case shall be made on the docket of case 18-cv-222. The parties are advised NOT to select the SPREAD TEXT option when filing in ECF, as this will result in repetitive docketing and emails. (ztd)
August 5, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 7/29/2019 (Marcus, Kenneth)
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 07/29/2019. (Marcus, Kenneth)
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/29/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/27/2019. (Marcus, Kenneth)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that case 19-cv-2177 is CONSOLIDATED with consolidated case 18-cv-222 pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42(a) (permitting sua sponte consolidation of cases presenting common questions of law or fact). All future filings in this case shall be made on the docket of case 18-cv-222. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 8/5/2019. (lccrc1)
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Motion to Consolidate by ALEX M. AZAR, II (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Motion to Consolidate)(Orloff, Serena)
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zeg)
July 25, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zeg)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 18-0222. (Marcus, Kenneth)
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ASANTE ROGUE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, AVOYELLES HOSPITAL, BAYLOR SCOTT & WHITE FORT WORTH, BAYLOR SCOTT & WHITE MEDICAL CENTER IRVING, BAYLOR SCOTT & WHITE MEDICAL CENTER - GARLAND, BAYLOR SCOTT & WHITE MEDICAL CENTER -WAXAHACHIE, BAYLOR SCOTT & WHITE MEDICAL CENTER TEMPLE, BAYLOR SCOTT & WHITE MEDICAL CENTER-CARROLLTON, BAYLOR UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER AT DALLAS, CHI SAINT LUKE'S HEALTH-BAYLOR SAINT LUKE'S MEDICAL CENTER, HEALTH FIRST CAPE CANAVERAL HOSPITAL, HONORHEALTH DEER VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, HONORHEALTH JOHN C. LINCOLN MEDICAL CENTER, HOSPITAL EPISCOPAL CRISTO REDENTOR, HOSPITAL SAN LUCAS PONCE, NOVANT HEALTH ROWAN MEDICAL CENTER, OAKDALE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, PROVIDENCE HOLY FAMILY HOSPITAL, PROVIDENCE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER EVERETT COLBY CAMPUS, PROVIDENCE SAINT PETER HOSPITAL, SAINT LUKE'S EAST HOSPITAL, SAINT LUKE'S HOSPITAL OF KANSAS CITY (Marcus, Kenneth)
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW AND DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against ALEX M. AZAR, II SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6272871) filed by OAKDALE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, HOSPITAL SAN LUCAS PONCE, BAYLOR SCOTT & WHITE FORT WORTH, SAINT LUKE'S EAST HOSPITAL, PROVIDENCE SAINT PETER HOSPITAL, HOSPITAL EPISCOPAL CRISTO REDENTOR, AVOYELLES HOSPITAL, PROVIDENCE HOLY FAMILY HOSPITAL, PROVIDENCE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER EVERETT COLBY CAMPUS, ASANTE ROGUE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, BAYLOR SCOTT & WHITE MEDICAL CENTER IRVING, SAINT LUKE'S HOSPITAL OF KANSAS CITY, BAYLOR SCOTT & WHITE MEDICAL CENTER - GARLAND, HEALTH FIRST CAPE CANAVERAL HOSPITAL, BAYLOR SCOTT & WHITE MEDICAL CENTER -WAXAHACHIE, CHI SAINT LUKE'S HEALTH-BAYLOR SAINT LUKE'S MEDICAL CENTER, HONORHEALTH DEER VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, BAYLOR SCOTT & WHITE MEDICAL CENTER-CARROLLTON, BAYLOR UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER AT DALLAS, HONORHEALTH JOHN C. LINCOLN MEDICAL CENTER, NOVANT HEALTH ROWAN MEDICAL CENTER, BAYLOR SCOTT & WHITE MEDICAL CENTER TEMPLE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Summons SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, #7 Summons ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE UNITED STATES, #8 Summons UNITED STATES ATTORNEY)(Marcus, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AVOYELLES HOSPITAL et al v. AZAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOSPITAL EPISCOPAL CRISTO REDENTOR
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PROVIDENCE SAINT PETER HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HONORHEALTH DEER VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PROVIDENCE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER EVERETT COLBY CAMPUS
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAYLOR UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER AT DALLAS
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAYLOR SCOTT & WHITE MEDICAL CENTER-CARROLLTON
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAYLOR SCOTT & WHITE MEDICAL CENTER -WAXAHACHIE
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HEALTH FIRST CAPE CANAVERAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OAKDALE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHI SAINT LUKE'S HEALTH-BAYLOR SAINT LUKE'S MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAINT LUKE'S EAST HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PROVIDENCE HOLY FAMILY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAINT LUKE'S HOSPITAL OF KANSAS CITY
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAYLOR SCOTT & WHITE MEDICAL CENTER TEMPLE
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAYLOR SCOTT & WHITE FORT WORTH
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAYLOR SCOTT & WHITE MEDICAL CENTER - GARLAND
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AVOYELLES HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAYLOR SCOTT & WHITE MEDICAL CENTER IRVING
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NOVANT HEALTH ROWAN MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASANTE ROGUE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HONORHEALTH JOHN C. LINCOLN MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOSPITAL SAN LUCAS PONCE
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?