ROTH et al v. ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN
Plaintiff: Amy Payne, Robert S. Bruce, CASSANDRA ISABELLA, JAMES R. WILLIAMSON, CAROLJEAN DOYLE, Chad M. Stephens, Victoria A. Rivera, I. F., DANIEL DESENS, SR., Elizabeth A. Rivera, AUSTIN DANIELS, DAVIANA FRASER, JEFFREY A. LEAKE, DONALD MCCALLUM, ANTONIO FRASER, Lloyd Williams, BETTY JANE LEAKE, Jerry T. Moorhouse, Jeffrey N. Walton, MALLORY J. LEAKE, Katie A. Rivera, MELBA CHERRY, MICHELLE GARCIA, Thomas Jr. Rivera, Alan N. Payne, ROY FARVE, PIERCE R. MCCALLUM, ANDREA CHERRY, Thomas Rivera, Ralph Isabella, CAROLINE J. WILLIAMSON, Sheila Ann Rivera, ZACHARY FARVE, Sheila A. Rivera, Liam Payne, JAMES F. WILLIAMSON, PATRICIA DESENS, Zachary Carl Roth, BYRON CHERRY, James Isabella, JAMES CHERRY, S. R., Dorron Watkins, Julie A. Rivera, RON WATKINS, JASON E. DANIELS, THOMAS RIVERA, JR. and JERRY T MOORHOUSE
Defendant: ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN
Case Number: 1:2019cv02179
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Trevor N McFadden
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1605A
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by ROBERT S. BRUCE, ANDREA CHERRY, BYRON CHERRY, JAMES CHERRY, MELBA CHERRY, AUSTIN DANIELS, JASON E. DANIELS, DANIEL DESENS, SR, PATRICIA DESENS, CAROLJEAN DOYLE, I. F., ROY FARVE, ZACHARY FARVE, ANTONIO FRASER, DAVIANA FRASER, MICHELLE GARCIA, CASSANDRA ISABELLA, JAMES ISABELLA, RALPH ISABELLA, BETTY JANE LEAKE, JEFFREY A. LEAKE, MALLORY J. LEAKE, DONALD MCCALLUM, PIERCE R. MCCALLUM, JERRY T MOORHOUSE, ALAN N. PAYNE, AMY PAYNE, LIAM PAYNE, S. R., ELIZABETH A. RIVERA, JULIE A. RIVERA, KATIE A. RIVERA, SHEILA A. RIVERA, SHEILA ANN RIVERA, THOMAS RIVERA, JR, THOMAS RIVERA, VICTORIA A. RIVERA, ZACHARY CARL ROTH, CHAD M. STEPHENS, JEFFREY N. WALTON, DORRON WATKINS, RON WATKINS, LLOYD WILLIAMS, CAROLINE J. WILLIAMSON, JAMES F. WILLIAMSON, JAMES R. WILLIAMSON re #4 Order on Motion for Leave to File (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Lakin, Bradley)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 7/29/2019. (lctnm3)
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zeg)
July 29, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zeg)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Addresses Under Seal. Please see order for details. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on 7/26/2019. (zeg)
July 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Proposed Order by Robert S. Bruce, ANDREA CHERRY, BYRON CHERRY, JAMES CHERRY, MELBA CHERRY, AUSTIN DANIELS, JASON E. DANIELS, DANIEL DESENS, SR, PATRICIA DESENS, CAROLJEAN DOYLE, I. F., ROY FARVE, ZACHARY FARVE, ANTONIO FRASER, DAVIANA FRASER, MICHELLE GARCIA, CASSANDRA ISABELLA, James Isabella, Ralph Isabella, BETTY JANE LEAKE, JEFFREY A. LEAKE, MALLORY J. LEAKE, DONALD MCCALLUM, PIERCE R. MCCALLUM, Jerry T. Moorhouse, Alan N. Payne, Amy Payne, Liam Payne, S. R., Elizabeth A. Rivera, Julie A. Rivera, Katie A. Rivera, Sheila A. Rivera, Sheila Ann Rivera, Thomas Jr. Rivera, Thomas Rivera, Victoria A. Rivera, Zachary Carl Roth, Chad M. Stephens, RON WATKINS, CAROLINE J. WILLIAMSON, JAMES F. WILLIAMSON, JAMES R. WILLIAMSON, Jeffrey N. Walton, Dorron Watkins, Lloyd Williams re #2 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Addresses Under Seal (Lakin, Bradley)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Addresses Under Seal by Robert S. Bruce, ANDREA CHERRY, BYRON CHERRY, JAMES CHERRY, MELBA CHERRY, AUSTIN DANIELS, JASON E. DANIELS, DANIEL DESENS, SR, PATRICIA DESENS, CAROLJEAN DOYLE, I. F., ROY FARVE, ZACHARY FARVE, ANTONIO FRASER, DAVIANA FRASER, MICHELLE GARCIA, CASSANDRA ISABELLA, James Isabella, Ralph Isabella, BETTY JANE LEAKE, JEFFREY A. LEAKE, MALLORY J. LEAKE, DONALD MCCALLUM, PIERCE R. MCCALLUM, Jerry T. Moorhouse, Alan N. Payne, Amy Payne, Liam Payne, S. R., Elizabeth A. Rivera, Julie A. Rivera, Katie A. Rivera, Sheila A. Rivera, Sheila Ann Rivera, Thomas Jr. Rivera, Thomas Rivera, Victoria A. Rivera, Zachary Carl Roth, Chad M. Stephens, RON WATKINS, CAROLINE J. WILLIAMSON, JAMES F. WILLIAMSON, JAMES R. WILLIAMSON, Jeffrey N. Walton, Dorron Watkins, Lloyd Williams (Lakin, Bradley)
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6272921) filed by DAVIANA FRASER, I. F., Victoria A. Rivera, CASSANDRA ISABELLA, BYRON CHERRY, Thomas Jr. Rivera, Robert S. Bruce, S. R., Julie A. Rivera, CAROLJEAN DOYLE, Sheila A. Rivera, JASON E. DANIELS, ANDREA CHERRY, MELBA CHERRY, ROY FARVE, MALLORY J. LEAKE, Thomas Rivera, Katie A. Rivera, JAMES CHERRY, Amy Payne, ANTONIO FRASER, PATRICIA DESENS, Liam Payne, JAMES F. WILLIAMSON, RON WATKINS, MICHELLE GARCIA, Dorron Watkins, Jerry T. Moorhouse, ZACHARY FARVE, James Isabella, BETTY JANE LEAKE, Zachary Carl Roth, DONALD MCCALLUM, Alan N. Payne, JAMES R. WILLIAMSON, Chad M. Stephens, Sheila Ann Rivera, Jeffrey N. Walton, JEFFREY A. LEAKE, Lloyd Williams, DANIEL DESENS, SR, AUSTIN DANIELS, PIERCE R. MCCALLUM, CAROLINE J. WILLIAMSON, Elizabeth A. Rivera, Ralph Isabella. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet CIVIL COVER SHEET, #2 Summons SUMMONS)(Lakin, Bradley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ROTH et al v. ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Payne
Represented By: Bradley M. Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert S. Bruce
Represented By: Bradley M. Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CASSANDRA ISABELLA
Represented By: Bradley M. Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES R. WILLIAMSON
Represented By: Bradley M. Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAROLJEAN DOYLE
Represented By: Bradley M. Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad M. Stephens
Represented By: Bradley M. Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria A. Rivera
Represented By: Bradley M. Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: I. F.
Represented By: Bradley M. Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL DESENS, SR.
Represented By: Bradley M. Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth A. Rivera
Represented By: Bradley M. Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AUSTIN DANIELS
Represented By: Bradley M. Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVIANA FRASER
Represented By: Bradley M. Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFREY A. LEAKE
Represented By: Bradley M. Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONALD MCCALLUM
Represented By: Bradley M. Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTONIO FRASER
Represented By: Bradley M. Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lloyd Williams
Represented By: Bradley M. Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BETTY JANE LEAKE
Represented By: Bradley M. Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry T. Moorhouse
Represented By: Bradley M. Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey N. Walton
Represented By: Bradley M. Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MALLORY J. LEAKE
Represented By: Bradley M. Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katie A. Rivera
Represented By: Bradley M. Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MELBA CHERRY
Represented By: Bradley M. Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHELLE GARCIA
Represented By: Bradley M. Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Jr. Rivera
Represented By: Bradley M. Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan N. Payne
Represented By: Bradley M. Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROY FARVE
Represented By: Bradley M. Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PIERCE R. MCCALLUM
Represented By: Bradley M. Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDREA CHERRY
Represented By: Bradley M. Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Rivera
Represented By: Bradley M. Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph Isabella
Represented By: Bradley M. Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAROLINE J. WILLIAMSON
Represented By: Bradley M. Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Ann Rivera
Represented By: Bradley M. Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZACHARY FARVE
Represented By: Bradley M. Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila A. Rivera
Represented By: Bradley M. Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liam Payne
Represented By: Bradley M. Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES F. WILLIAMSON
Represented By: Bradley M. Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICIA DESENS
Represented By: Bradley M. Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachary Carl Roth
Represented By: Bradley M. Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BYRON CHERRY
Represented By: Bradley M. Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Isabella
Represented By: Bradley M. Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES CHERRY
Represented By: Bradley M. Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. R.
Represented By: Bradley M. Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorron Watkins
Represented By: Bradley M. Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie A. Rivera
Represented By: Bradley M. Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RON WATKINS
Represented By: Bradley M. Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JASON E. DANIELS
Represented By: Bradley M. Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS RIVERA, JR.
Represented By: Bradley M. Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JERRY T MOORHOUSE
Represented By: Bradley M. Lakin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?