PRUITT et al
Petitioner: RICHARD JOE PRUITT, JR
Case Number: 1:2019cv02193
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition: General (Habeas Corpus)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Receipt on 09/04/2019 of Electronic Transfer. Other Court Number 5:19-cv-00256 sent by Northern District of West Virginia. (zrdj)
September 4, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred to the USDC for the Northern District of West Virginia, pursuant to the Court Order entered 08/08/2019. Sent to Court via Electronically. (zrdj)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING PRO SE CASE to the United States District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia. See attached order for full details. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Transfer due by 8/28/2019. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 8/8/2019. (zjd)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by RICHARD JOE PRUITT, JR (zmc)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by RICHARD JOE PRUITT, JR (zmc)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by RICHARD JOE PRUITT, JR. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit)(zmc)
July 19, 2019 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 07/19/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zmc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PRUITT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: RICHARD JOE PRUITT, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?