CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY et al v. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Plaintiff: CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, INC., ENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT and CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY
Defendant: U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Not Yet Classified: ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Case Number: 1:2019cv02198
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Ketanji Brown Jackson
Nature of Suit: Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES APPLICABLE TO APA CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Court's instructions for batching motions and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 8/16/2019. (lckbj1)
August 14, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/8/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Townsend, Margaret)
August 14, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 8/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Townsend, Margaret)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY served on 8/5/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Townsend, Margaret)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy R. Atwood on behalf of CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, ENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT (Atwood, Amy)
July 26, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zeg)
July 26, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. Judge Carl J. Nichols is no longer assigned to the case. (zeg)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, ENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT. Case related to Case No. 19-688. (Townsend, Margaret)
July 26, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zeg)
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6274832) filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, INC., ENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Corporate Disclosure)(Townsend, Margaret)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY et al v. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, INC.
Represented By: Margaret E. Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT
Represented By: Margaret E. Townsend
Represented By: Amy R. Atwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY
Represented By: Margaret E. Townsend
Represented By: Amy R. Atwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?