HOWELL v. ST. LOUIS COUNTY, MO et al
Petitioner: CRUZ HOWELL
Respondent: ST. LOUIS COUNTY, MO, TROY DOYLE and 21# JUDICIAL CIRCUIT COURT
Case Number: 1:2019cv02264
Filed: July 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition: General (Habeas Corpus)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Receipt on 08/13/2019 of Electronic Transfer. Other Court Number 4:19-cv-02343 sent by Eastern District of Missouri. (zrdj)
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 Case transferred to the USDC for the Eastern District of Missouri, pursuant to the Court Order entered 08/09/2019. Sent to Court via Electronically. (zsb)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TRANSFERRING PRO SE CASE FORTHWITH to the USDC for the Eastern District of Missouri. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 08/08/2019. (Attachment: #1 19-cv-1712 Transfer Order filed 06/24/2019) (zsb)
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE, CONSENT, AND REFERENCE OF A CIVIL ACTION TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE by CRUZ HOWELL (zmc)
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by CRUZ HOWELL (zmc)
July 25, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by CRUZ HOWELL (zmc)
July 25, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by CRUZ HOWELL. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit)(zmc)
July 25, 2019 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 07/25/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zmc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HOWELL v. ST. LOUIS COUNTY, MO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ST. LOUIS COUNTY, MO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: TROY DOYLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: 21# JUDICIAL CIRCUIT COURT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CRUZ HOWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?