LIPSKAR v. CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: ELIYAHU LIPSKAR
Defendant: CAPITAL ONE, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. and CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORPORATION
Case Number: 1:2019cv02328
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: James E Boasberg
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER GRANTING Defendants' #5 Motion to Stay. The Court ORDERS that all proceedings and deadlines in this case are STAYED until the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation resolves the Motions for Consolidation and Transfer Under 28 U.S.C. 1407 filed in In re Capital One Consumer Data Breach Litigation, MDL No. 2915 (J.P.M.L. July 31, 2019). So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 08/22/2019. (lcjeb2) Modified to capitalize "stay" on 8/22/2019 (znbn).
August 21, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Stay or, in the Alternative, for an Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A., CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORPORATION, CAPITAL ONE, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Toro, John). Added MOTION for Extension of Time on 8/22/2019 (ztth).
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Motion of District Of Columbia Plaintiffs for Transfer to and Consolidation or Coordination of Related Actions in the District of the District Of Columbia, In re: Capital One Consumer Data Security Breach Litigation, MDL No. 2915. by ELIYAHU LIPSKAR (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Certificate of Service)(Nussbaum, Linda)
August 5, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A., CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORPORATION, CAPITAL ONE, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zeg)
August 5, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zeg)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by ELIYAHU LIPSKAR. Case related to Case No. 19-cv-2265. (zeg)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A., CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORPORATION, CAPITAL ONE, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6297002) filed by ELIYAHU LIPSKAR. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Nussbaum, Linda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LIPSKAR v. CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAPITAL ONE, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Represented By: John C. Toro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.
Represented By: John C. Toro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORPORATION
Represented By: John C. Toro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELIYAHU LIPSKAR
Represented By: Linda P. Nussbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?