REED v. MCCARTHY et al
Plaintiff: JAMES THOMAS REED
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, RYAN D. MCCARTHY and FRANCINE BLACKMON
Case Number: 1:2019cv02329
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Dabney L Friedrich
Nature of Suit: Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Case reassign to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (zad)
August 27, 2019 Filing 7 SEALED DOCUMENT (Appendix) filed by JAMES THOMAS REED. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (zad)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and #3 Motion for U.S. Marshal to Serve Complaint and Summons. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court assign this case randomly to a judge for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 8/24/2019. (zad)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by JAMES THOMAS REED (zsb)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 APPENDIX by JAMES THOMAS REED. (zsb)
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for US Marshal to Serve Complaint and Summons by JAMES THOMAS REED (zmc)
July 29, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JAMES THOMAS REED (zmc)
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FRANCINE BLACKMON, DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, RYAN D. MCCARTHY with Jury Demand filed by JAMES THOMAS REED. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(zmc)
July 29, 2019 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 07/29/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zmc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: REED v. MCCARTHY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RYAN D. MCCARTHY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRANCINE BLACKMON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES THOMAS REED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?