CITIBANK, N.A. v. LANCE BAILEY & ASSOCIATES, INC. et al
Plaintiff: CITIBANK, N.A.
Defendant: LANCE BAILEY & ASSOCIATES, INC., LANCELOT O BAILEY, THE BAILEY HENDERSON LIVING TRUST, LANCELOT O. BAILEY and BAILEY HENDERSON LIVING TRUST
Case Number: 1:2019cv02373
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Randolph D Moss
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 11/8/2019, at 2:00 PM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER FOR INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The Initial Scheduling Conference is hereby set for November 8, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 21. See attached order for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 9/27/19. (lcrdm1, )
September 26, 2019 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re #8 Answer to Complaint was entered in error as it is a duplicate of #7 . (ztd)
September 26, 2019 Filing 8 ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by LANCE BAILEY & ASSOCIATES, INC..(Cooke, Frederick) Modified on 9/27/2019 (ztd).
September 26, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by LANCELOT O. BAILEY, BAILEY HENDERSON LIVING TRUST,LANCE BAILEY & ASSOCIATES, INC..(Cooke, Frederick) Modified to add filer on 9/27/2019 (ztd).
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. LANCELOT O. BAILEY served on 9/4/2019, answer due 9/25/2019 (McJunkin, John)
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. BAILEY HENDERSON LIVING TRUST served on 9/4/2019, answer due 9/25/2019 (McJunkin, John)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. LANCE BAILEY & ASSOCIATES, INC. served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019 (McJunkin, John)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 08/07/2019. (lcrdm1, )
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to LANCELOT O. BAILEY, BAILEY HENDERSON LIVING TRUST, LANCE BAILEY & ASSOCIATES, INC. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zjd)
August 7, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zjd)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6305047) filed by CITIBANK, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(McJunkin, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CITIBANK, N.A. v. LANCE BAILEY & ASSOCIATES, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LANCE BAILEY & ASSOCIATES, INC.
Represented By: Frederick D. Cooke, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LANCELOT O BAILEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE BAILEY HENDERSON LIVING TRUST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LANCELOT O. BAILEY
Represented By: Frederick D. Cooke, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAILEY HENDERSON LIVING TRUST
Represented By: Frederick D. Cooke, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CITIBANK, N.A.
Represented By: John G. McJunkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?