RESTORE PUBLIC TRUST v. U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION et al
Plaintiff: RESTORE PUBLIC TRUST
Defendant: U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION and U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Case Number: 1:2019cv02410
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amit P Mehta
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 10/16/2019. (zjd)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond. The Defendant shall file an Answer on or before October 16, 2019. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 09/25/2019. (lcapm2)
September 23, 2019 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Palmer-Ball, Katherine)
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/26/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/25/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/26/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 8/26/2019; U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION served on 8/26/2019 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit)(Collette, Matthew)
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Boyd Palmer-Ball on behalf of All Defendants (Palmer-Ball, Katherine)
August 9, 2019 Filing 4 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by RESTORE PUBLIC TRUST (Collette, Matthew) (Main Document 4 replaced on 8/14/2019) (zjf).
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zeg)
August 9, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zeg)
August 9, 2019 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re #2 LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading. (zeg)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 ENTERED IN ERROR.....LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by RESTORE PUBLIC TRUST (Collette, Matthew) (Main Document 2 replaced on 8/9/2019) (zeg). Modified on 8/9/2019 (zeg).
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6311367) filed by RESTORE PUBLIC TRUST. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Civil Cover Sheet, #12 Summons AG summons, #13 Summons US Atty summons, #14 Summons FDA summons, #15 Summons HHS Summons)(Collette, Matthew) (Attachment 11 replaced on 8/9/2019) (zeg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RESTORE PUBLIC TRUST v. U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RESTORE PUBLIC TRUST
Represented By: Matthew M. Collette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION
Represented By: Katherine Boyd Palmer-Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Represented By: Katherine Boyd Palmer-Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?