DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION v. CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES
Plaintiff: DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION
Defendant: CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES
Case Number: 1:2019cv02413
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Royce C Lamberth
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES.(Cohen, Jason)
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Todd Cohen on behalf of CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES (Cohen, Jason)
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES served on 8/14/2019, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/14/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/21/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/20/2019.) (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Lewis, John)
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zeg)
August 9, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (zeg)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION (Lewis, John)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6311988) filed by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Lewis, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION v. CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION
Represented By: John T. Lewis, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES
Represented By: Jason Todd Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?