JENKINS et al v. NATIONAL RAILROAD CORPORATION
Plaintiff: ALBERT JENKINS and JODY JOHNSON
Defendant: NATIONAL RAILROAD CORPORATION
Case Number: 1:2019cv02414
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Randolph D Moss
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 9/20/19., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/20/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/19/2019.) (ztd)
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS (3) Issued as to NATIONAL RAILROAD CORPORATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zeg)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 08/27/2019. (lcrdm2, )
August 27, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (zad)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis: It is hereby ORDERED that Jody Johnson is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as a party plaintiff; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall assign this case randomly to a judge for further proceedings. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 8/27/2019. (zad)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ALBERT JENKINS (zrdj)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NATIONAL RAILROAD CORPORATION with Jury Demand filed by ALBERT JENKINS, JODY JOHNSON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(zrdj)
August 9, 2019 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 8/9/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zrdj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JENKINS et al v. NATIONAL RAILROAD CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALBERT JENKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JODY JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL RAILROAD CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?