ROCHESTER GENERAL HOSPITAL et al v. AZAR
Plaintiff: NEWARK-WAYNE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, THE ROCHESTER GENERAL HOSPITAL and ROCHESTER GENERAL HOSPITAL
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Case Number: 1:2019cv02432
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: John D Bates
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 13 Memorandum in opposition to re #12 MOTION to Vacate Deadline to Respond to Complaint MOTION to Stay filed by NEWARK-WAYNE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, ROCHESTER GENERAL HOSPITAL. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Webster, Stephanie)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon considered of #12 defendant's motion to vacate deadline to respond to complaint, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that any opposition to defendant's motion shall be filed by not later than 12:00pm on October 11, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 10/10/2019. (lcjdb3)
October 10, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Vacate Deadline to Respond to Complaint, MOTION to Stay by ALEX M. AZAR, II (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Orloff, Serena)
October 7, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Inclusion in Motion to Consolidate by ALEX M. AZAR, II (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Orloff, Serena)
October 7, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Serena Maya Schulz Orloff on behalf of ALEX M. AZAR, II (Orloff, Serena)
September 5, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF REPLY IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION FOR MORE LIMITED CONSOLIDATION by NEWARK-WAYNE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, ROCHESTER GENERAL HOSPITAL re #5 Notice (Other) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Webster, Stephanie)
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 8/19/2019 (Webster, Stephanie)
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 8/19/19. (Webster, Stephanie)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/14/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/13/2019. (Webster, Stephanie)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE AND CROSS-MOTION FOR MORE LIMITED CONSOLIDATION by NEWARK-WAYNE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, THE ROCHESTER GENERAL HOSPITAL (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Webster, Stephanie)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zeg)
August 12, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge John D. Bates. (zeg)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by NEWARK-WAYNE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, THE ROCHESTER GENERAL HOSPITAL. Case related to Case No. 17-cv-2668; 18-cv-936; 18-cv-2705. (Webster, Stephanie)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by NEWARK-WAYNE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, THE ROCHESTER GENERAL HOSPITAL (Webster, Stephanie)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALEX M. AZAR, II ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6314656) filed by THE ROCHESTER GENERAL HOSPITAL, NEWARK-WAYNE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Webster, Stephanie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ROCHESTER GENERAL HOSPITAL et al v. AZAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NEWARK-WAYNE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE ROCHESTER GENERAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROCHESTER GENERAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Represented By: Serena Maya Schulz Orloff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?