SANDERS v. NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION
Plaintiff: TORRENCE SANDERS
Defendant: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION
Case Number: 1:2019cv02445
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amit P Mehta
Nature of Suit: Family and Medical Leave Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Filing 11 Memorandum in opposition to re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by TORRENCE SANDERS. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Leo, Jonathan)
September 27, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph B. Greener on behalf of NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (Greener, Joseph)
September 25, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Response due by 10/9/2019. (zjd)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The clear preference in this Circuit is to resolve cases on their merits, and not by default judgment. See Jackson v. Beech, 636 F.2d 831, 835 (D.C. Cir. 1980). In view of this preference, and the absence of any prejudice to Plaintiff caused by Defendant's late filing, Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Untimely Filed Motion to Dismiss and Request for the Clerk of the Court to Enter a Default #6 is denied. Defendant's Motion for Leave to Accept its Motion to Dismiss #7 is granted. Plaintiff shall respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by October 9, 2019. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 09/25/2019. (lcapm3)
September 24, 2019 Filing 9 Memorandum in opposition to re #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading Under Rule 6(b)(1)(B) filed by TORRENCE SANDERS. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Leo, Jonathan)
September 20, 2019 Filing 8 Memorandum in opposition to re #6 MOTION to Strike #4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Enter Default MOTION for Entry of Default filed by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION. (Davis, Alison)
September 20, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading Under Rule 6(b)(1)(B) by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Alison)
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Strike #4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Enter Default by TORRENCE SANDERS (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Leo, Jonathan). Added MOTION for Entry of Default on 9/18/2019 (znmw).
September 13, 2019 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: #5 Order was erroneously filed in this case. (zjd)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ENTERED IN ERROR.....ORDER. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 09/13/2019. (lcapm3) Modified on 9/13/2019 (zjd).
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Alison)
September 11, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Show Cause due by 9/20/2019. (zjd)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff shall show cause by September 20, 2019, why this matter should not be dismissed for want of prosecution. Defendant failed to file an answer by September 6, 2019, yet Plaintiff has not moved for entry of default under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 55(a). Plaintiff may satisfy this order to show cause by seeking entry of a default from the Clerk of the Court. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 09/11/2019. (lcapm3) Modified document type on 9/12/2019 (zjd)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION served on 8/16/2019, answer due 9/6/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Signed green card)(Leo, Jonathan)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zeg)
August 13, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zeg)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6318647) filed by Torrence Sanders. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover sheet, #2 Summons Summons)(Leo, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SANDERS v. NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TORRENCE SANDERS
Represented By: Jonathan Donald Leo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION
Represented By: Alison N. Davis
Represented By: Joseph B. Greener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?