MILLER v. CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: KELLY MILLER
Defendant: CAPITAL ONE, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORPORATION and CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02447
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: James E Boasberg
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Case Stayed. (znbn)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that Defendants' #7 Motion to Stay is GRANTED, and the case is STAYED until the JPML rules on consolidation and transfer. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 08/29/2019. (lcjeb2)
August 28, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Stay , MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to the Complaint by CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A., CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORPORATION, CAPITAL ONE, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Toro, John)
August 21, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE by KELLY MILLER. CAPITAL ONE, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION waiver sent on 8/20/2019, answer due 10/19/2019. (Nussbaum, Linda)
August 21, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE by KELLY MILLER. CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORPORATION waiver sent on 8/20/2019, answer due 10/19/2019. (Nussbaum, Linda)
August 21, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE by KELLY MILLER. CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. waiver sent on 8/20/2019, answer due 10/19/2019. (Nussbaum, Linda)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A., CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORPORATION, CAPITAL ONE, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zeg)
August 13, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zeg)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by KELLY MILLER. Case related to Case No. 19-cv-2265. (zeg)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A., CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORPORATION, CAPITAL ONE, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6319371) filed by KELLY MILLER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Nussbaum, Linda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MILLER v. CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAPITAL ONE, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Represented By: John C. Toro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORPORATION
Represented By: John C. Toro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.
Represented By: John C. Toro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KELLY MILLER
Represented By: Linda P. Nussbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?