TACON v. WALKER et al
Plaintiff: WILLIAM TACON, ADMINISTRATOR OF NATIONAL BANK OF ANGUILLA (PRIVATE BANKING & TRUST) LTD and WILLIAM TACON
Defendant: CLAUDE WALKER and AMBER WALKER
Case Number: 1:2019cv02484
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Trevor N McFadden
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Defendants' #9 Second Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall file their Answer or otherwise respond to the Plaintiff's #1 Complaint on or before October 28, 2019. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 10/11/2019. (lctnm2)
October 11, 2019 Filing 9 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by AMBER WALKER, CLAUDE WALKER (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order to Extend Deadline to Answer)(Vernia, Benjamin)
September 10, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' Answer or response to the Plaintiff's Complaint due by 10/14/2019. (hmc)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time. Upon consideration of the Defendants' #8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, it is hereby ordered that the Defendants shall file their Answer or otherwise respond to the Plaintiff's #1 Complaint on or before October 14, 2019. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 09/10/2019. (lctnm2)
September 9, 2019 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by AMBER WALKER, CLAUDE WALKER (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Vernia, Benjamin)
September 9, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin James Vernia on behalf of All Defendants (Vernia, Benjamin)
August 28, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. AMBER WALKER served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019; CLAUDE WALKER served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019 (Murphy, James)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 08/22/2019. (lctnm2)
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to AMBER WALKER, CLAUDE WALKER. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmc)
August 22, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zmc)
August 21, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET by WILLIAM TACON re #1 Complaint, filed by WILLIAM TACON. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by WILLIAM TACON.(Murphy, James)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WILLIAM TACON, ADMINISTRATOR OF NATIONAL BANK OF ANGUILLA (PRIVATE BANKING & TRUST) LTD (Murphy, James)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AMBER WALKER, CLAUDE WALKER ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6327336) filed by WILLIAM TACON, ADMINISTRATOR OF NATIONAL BANK OF ANGUILLA (PRIVATE BANKING & TRUST) LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Loan Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2-Promissory Note, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons Claude Walker, #5 Summons Amber Walker)(Murphy, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TACON v. WALKER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLAUDE WALKER
Represented By: Benjamin James Vernia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMBER WALKER
Represented By: Benjamin James Vernia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM TACON, ADMINISTRATOR OF NATIONAL BANK OF ANGUILLA (PRIVATE BANKING & TRUST) LTD
Represented By: James J. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM TACON
Represented By: James J. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?