OWENS et al v. RELIANCE PARTNERS LLC
Appellant: SONYA LARAYE OWENS
Appellee: RELIANCE PARTNERS LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv02491
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Rudolph Contreras
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 11:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Filing 8 Appellant's BRIEF by SONYA LARAYE OWENS. (ztd)
September 16, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for CM/ECF Password by SONYA LARAYE OWENS (jf)
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE to Counsel/Party (zrdj)
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal Bankruptcy Court case number 19-00489. Related document: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by SONYA LARAYE OWENS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(zrdj)
September 4, 2019 Filing 4 ERRATA by SONYA LARAYE OWENS #2 Notice of Related Case filed by SONYA LARAYE OWENS. (ztth)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT filed by SONYA LARAYE OWENS. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit - Attachment) (ztth)
August 20, 2019 Filing fee received: $ 400, receipt number: 4616100265. (tth)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by SONYA LARAYE OWENS. Case related to Case No. 19-489. (tth)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. File received filed by SONYA LARAYE OWENS. Bankruptcy Court Case number 19-00489 (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (tth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OWENS et al v. RELIANCE PARTNERS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: SONYA LARAYE OWENS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: RELIANCE PARTNERS LLC
Represented By: Aaron Gordon Sokolow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?