SCOTT et al v. MONSANTO COMPANY
Plaintiff: DONALD V. SCOTT, EARL-SCOTT Y. LAWANDA and LAWANDA YVETTE EARL-SCOTT
Defendant: MONSANTO COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2019cv02498
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Trevor N McFadden
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Receipt on 09/30/2019 of Electronic Transfer. Other Court Number 3:19-cv-06177 sent by California Northern District. (zrdj)
September 26, 2019 Filing 10 Case transferred to the USDC for the Northern District of California, pursuant to the Court Order entered 9/25/19; Sent to Court via extraction. (ztnr)
September 25, 2019 Filing 9 EMAIL from the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California requesting the transfer of the original file to be sent using the extract civil case feature of CM/ECF. (ztnr)
September 25, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO_153) dated 9/25/19 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation directing the transfer to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Vince Chhabria for coordinated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407.(MDL 2741) (ztnr)
September 10, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 10/27/2019, (ztth)
September 6, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE by DONALD V. SCOTT, LAWANDA YVETTE EARL-SCOTT. MONSANTO COMPANY waiver sent on 8/28/2019, answer due 10/27/2019. (Evans, Karen); Modified on 9/10/2019 (ztth).
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 08/26/2019. (lctnm3)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Wendy R. Fleishman shall promptly register for this Court's CM/ECF system. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 8/26/2019. (lctnm3)
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to MONSANTO COMPANY. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb)
August 22, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zsb)
August 21, 2019 Filing 4 ERRATA of Complaint by EARL-SCOTT Y. LAWANDA, DONALD V. SCOTT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Evans, Karen)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Wendy R. Fleishman, :Firm- Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, :Address- 250 Hudson Street, 8th Floor, New York, NY 10013. Phone No. - (212) 355-9500. Fax No. - (212)355-9592 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6329756. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by EARL-SCOTT Y. LAWANDA, DONALD V. SCOTT (Evans, Karen)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 3:16-md-2741. (Evans, Karen)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6329635) filed by DONALD V. SCOTT, EARL-SCOTT Y. LAWANDA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Evans, Karen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SCOTT et al v. MONSANTO COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MONSANTO COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONALD V. SCOTT
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Evans
Represented By: Wendy R. Fleishman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EARL-SCOTT Y. LAWANDA
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAWANDA YVETTE EARL-SCOTT
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Evans
Represented By: Wendy R. Fleishman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?