IMPERATORI v. CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: JOSE A IMPERATORI and JOSE A. IMPERATORI, III
Defendant: CAPITAL ONE, N.A., CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. and CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORPORATION
Case Number: 1:2019cv02503
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: James E Boasberg
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that Defendants' #7 Motion to Stay is GRANTED. All proceedings and deadlines in this case are stayed until the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation resolves the Motions for Consolidation and Transfer under 28 U.S.C. 1407 filed in In re Capital One Consumer Data Breach Litigation, MDL No. 2915 (J.P.M.L. July 31, 2019). So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 8/30/2019. (lcjeb3)
August 30, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION to Stay , MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to the Complaint by CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A., CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORPORATION, CAPITAL ONE, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Toro, John)
August 23, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zsb)
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE by JOSE A IMPERATORI. CAPITAL ONE, N.A. waiver sent on 8/21/2019, answer due 10/20/2019. (Vernia, Benjamin)
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE by JOSE A IMPERATORI. CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORPORATION waiver sent on 8/21/2019, answer due 10/20/2019. (Vernia, Benjamin)
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE by JOSE A IMPERATORI. CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. waiver sent on 8/21/2019, answer due 10/20/2019. (Vernia, Benjamin)
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 ERRATA to Edit Caption of Complaint by JOSE A IMPERATORI #1 Complaint, filed by JOSE A IMPERATORI. (Attachments: #1 Errata Complaint Edited to Comply with LCvR 5.1)(Vernia, Benjamin)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by JOSE A IMPERATORI. (zsb)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Class Action against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6330550) filed by JOSE A IMPERATORI. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Notice to Counsel/Party Related Case Form CO932)(Vernia, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IMPERATORI v. CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAPITAL ONE, N.A.
Represented By: John C. Toro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.
Represented By: John C. Toro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORPORATION
Represented By: John C. Toro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSE A IMPERATORI
Represented By: Benjamin James Vernia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSE A. IMPERATORI, III
Represented By: Benjamin James Vernia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?