HAMMONS et al v. ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN
Plaintiff: BRADLEY BUSBY, ANDRIA HARRIS, TASHIA EVANS, O.R.B., WILLIAM HARRIS, ERICA PLEIMAN, A.R.S., ADELE BUYTENHUYS, SHEENA SMITH, ANDREW BABBITT, DAVID EVANS, RYAN HAMMONS, NOREE KAMKONGKAEO, CLINTON BUYTENHUYS, DALE SMITH, JR., ANNIE SMITH, SHELDON BUYTENHUYS, RHETT MONEY, ROBERT NADEAU, II, DALE SMITH, SR., JENNA SCHWEICKERT, AARON MONEY, ROBERT HERNANDEZ, HALEY SCHWEICKERT, GABRIELLE SMITH, RYAN BUYTENHUYS, BRANDON JONES, ROBERT NADEAU, NICOLA RAVENSTEIN, CAMERON BUYTENHUYS, MIRANDA NADEAU, JENNIFER HERNANDEZ, CHRISTI BABBITT, I.M.S., ALLEN COX, SYLVIA BABBITT, DEREK PLEIMAN, BIANCA SMITH, E.B., A.L.N., LEE BABBITT, III, DARROLL BUYTENHUYS, M.L.B., M.A.B., ASHLEY BABBITT and TAYLOR-RAE SIMON
Defendant: ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN
Case Number: 1:2019cv02518
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Ketanji Brown Jackson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1605A
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF CLERK of mailing one copy of the summons, complaint, and notice of suit, together with a translation of each into the official language of the foreign state on Plaintiffs, by registered mail, return receipt requested, to the head of the ministry of foreign affairs, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(3). (Attachments: #1 Receipt of Mailing) (jf)
September 30, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST from Plaintiffs for the Clerk to effect service of one copy of the summons, complaint, and notice of suit, together with a translation of each into the official language of the foreign state, by registered mail, return receipt requested, to the head of the ministry of foreign affairs, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(3). (See Docket Entry #7 to view document) (jf)
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT REQUESTING FOREIGN MAILING under 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(3) by A.L.N., A.R.S., ANDREW BABBITT, ASHLEY BABBITT, CHRISTI BABBITT, LEE BABBITT, III, SYLVIA BABBITT, BRADLEY BUSBY, ADELE BUYTENHUYS, CAMERON BUYTENHUYS, CLINTON BUYTENHUYS, DARROLL BUYTENHUYS, RYAN BUYTENHUYS, SHELDON BUYTENHUYS, ALLEN COX, E.B., DAVID EVANS, TASHIA EVANS, RYAN HAMMONS, ANDRIA HARRIS, WILLIAM HARRIS, JENNIFER HERNANDEZ, ROBERT HERNANDEZ, I.M.S., BRANDON JONES, NOREE KAMKONGKAEO, M.A.B., M.L.B., AARON MONEY, RHETT MONEY, MIRANDA NADEAU, ROBERT NADEAU, II, O.R.B., DEREK PLEIMAN, ERICA PLEIMAN, NICOLA RAVENSTEIN, HALEY SCHWEICKERT, JENNA SCHWEICKERT, TAYLOR-RAE SIMON, ANNIE SMITH, BIANCA SMITH, DALE SMITH, SR, DALE SMITH, JR, GABRIELLE SMITH, SHEENA SMITH. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter to Clerk)(Hoffman, Kevin)
August 27, 2019 Filing 6 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by A.L.N., A.R.S., ANDREW BABBITT, ASHLEY BABBITT, CHRISTI BABBITT, LEE BABBITT, III, SYLVIA BABBITT, BRADLEY BUSBY, ADELE BUYTENHUYS, CAMERON BUYTENHUYS, CLINTON BUYTENHUYS, DARROLL BUYTENHUYS, RYAN BUYTENHUYS, SHELDON BUYTENHUYS, ALLEN COX, E.B., DAVID EVANS, TASHIA EVANS, RYAN HAMMONS, ANDRIA HARRIS, WILLIAM HARRIS, JENNIFER HERNANDEZ, ROBERT HERNANDEZ, I.M.S., BRANDON JONES, NOREE KAMKONGKAEO, M.A.B., M.L.B., AARON MONEY, RHETT MONEY, MIRANDA NADEAU, ROBERT NADEAU, II, O.R.B., DEREK PLEIMAN, ERICA PLEIMAN, NICOLA RAVENSTEIN, HALEY SCHWEICKERT, JENNA SCHWEICKERT, TAYLOR-RAE SIMON, ANNIE SMITH, BIANCA SMITH, DALE SMITH, SR, DALE SMITH, JR, GABRIELLE SMITH, SHEENA SMITH re Order on Motion for Waiver, (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Hoffman, Kevin)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #2 Motion for Waiver of LCvR 5.1(c)(1). It is hereby ORDERED that the requirement of Local Civil Rule5.1(c)(1) that each Plaintiff publicly disclose his or her "full residence address" on the initial pleading is WAIVED, and that within fourteen (14) days of entry of this Order, Plaintiffs shall file, UNDER SEAL, a notice listing the names and corresponding residence addresses of each Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 8/27/2019. (lckbj1)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Court's instructions for briefing motions and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 8/26/2019. (lckbj1)
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb)
August 23, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zsb)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Randy D. Singer on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Singer, Randy)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Waiver of Local Rule 5.1(c)(1) by A.L.N., A.R.S., ANDREW BABBITT, ASHLEY BABBITT, CHRISTI BABBITT, LEE BABBITT, III, SYLVIA BABBITT, BRADLEY BUSBY, ADELE BUYTENHUYS, CAMERON BUYTENHUYS, CLINTON BUYTENHUYS, DARROLL BUYTENHUYS, RYAN BUYTENHUYS, SHELDON BUYTENHUYS, ALLEN COX, E.B., DAVID EVANS, TASHIA EVANS, RYAN HAMMONS, ANDRIA HARRIS, WILLIAM HARRIS, JENNIFER HERNANDEZ, ROBERT HERNANDEZ, I.M.S., BRANDON JONES, NOREE KAMKONGKAEO, M.A.B., M.L.B., AARON MONEY, RHETT MONEY, MIRANDA NADEAU, ROBERT NADEAU, II, O.R.B., DEREK PLEIMAN, ERICA PLEIMAN, NICOLA RAVENSTEIN, HALEY SCHWEICKERT, JENNA SCHWEICKERT, TAYLOR-RAE SIMON, ANNIE SMITH, BIANCA SMITH, DALE SMITH, SR, DALE SMITH, JR, GABRIELLE SMITH, SHEENA SMITH (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hoffman, Kevin)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6332545) filed by ROBERT NADEAU, II, MIRANDA NADEAU, BIANCA SMITH, M.A.B., DALE SMITH, SR, NOREE KAMKONGKAEO, ADELE BUYTENHUYS, RYAN HAMMONS, CLINTON BUYTENHUYS, ERICA PLEIMAN, DARROLL BUYTENHUYS, BRADLEY BUSBY, ANNIE SMITH, NICOLA RAVENSTEIN, SHEENA SMITH, ANDRIA HARRIS, DALE SMITH, JR, CAMERON BUYTENHUYS, I.M.S., SYLVIA BABBITT, BRANDON JONES, TAYLOR-RAE SIMON, LEE BABBITT, III, GABRIELLE SMITH, DAVID EVANS, JENNIFER HERNANDEZ, A.R.S., RYAN BUYTENHUYS, DEREK PLEIMAN, ASHLEY BABBITT, WILLIAM HARRIS, JENNA SCHWEICKERT, AARON MONEY, O.R.B., ALLEN COX, CHRISTI BABBITT, E.B., M.L.B., RHETT MONEY, HALEY SCHWEICKERT, A.L.N., ROBERT HERNANDEZ, SHELDON BUYTENHUYS, TASHIA EVANS, ANDREW BABBITT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Hoffman, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HAMMONS et al v. ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRADLEY BUSBY
Represented By: Randy D. Singer
Represented By: Kevin A. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDRIA HARRIS
Represented By: Randy D. Singer
Represented By: Kevin A. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TASHIA EVANS
Represented By: Randy D. Singer
Represented By: Kevin A. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: O.R.B.
Represented By: Randy D. Singer
Represented By: Kevin A. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM HARRIS
Represented By: Randy D. Singer
Represented By: Kevin A. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERICA PLEIMAN
Represented By: Randy D. Singer
Represented By: Kevin A. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.R.S.
Represented By: Randy D. Singer
Represented By: Kevin A. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADELE BUYTENHUYS
Represented By: Randy D. Singer
Represented By: Kevin A. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHEENA SMITH
Represented By: Randy D. Singer
Represented By: Kevin A. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDREW BABBITT
Represented By: Randy D. Singer
Represented By: Kevin A. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID EVANS
Represented By: Randy D. Singer
Represented By: Kevin A. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RYAN HAMMONS
Represented By: Randy D. Singer
Represented By: Kevin A. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NOREE KAMKONGKAEO
Represented By: Randy D. Singer
Represented By: Kevin A. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLINTON BUYTENHUYS
Represented By: Randy D. Singer
Represented By: Kevin A. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DALE SMITH, JR.
Represented By: Randy D. Singer
Represented By: Kevin A. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANNIE SMITH
Represented By: Randy D. Singer
Represented By: Kevin A. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHELDON BUYTENHUYS
Represented By: Randy D. Singer
Represented By: Kevin A. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RHETT MONEY
Represented By: Randy D. Singer
Represented By: Kevin A. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT NADEAU, II
Represented By: Randy D. Singer
Represented By: Kevin A. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DALE SMITH, SR.
Represented By: Randy D. Singer
Represented By: Kevin A. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENNA SCHWEICKERT
Represented By: Randy D. Singer
Represented By: Kevin A. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AARON MONEY
Represented By: Randy D. Singer
Represented By: Kevin A. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT HERNANDEZ
Represented By: Randy D. Singer
Represented By: Kevin A. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HALEY SCHWEICKERT
Represented By: Randy D. Singer
Represented By: Kevin A. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GABRIELLE SMITH
Represented By: Randy D. Singer
Represented By: Kevin A. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RYAN BUYTENHUYS
Represented By: Randy D. Singer
Represented By: Kevin A. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRANDON JONES
Represented By: Randy D. Singer
Represented By: Kevin A. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT NADEAU
Represented By: Randy D. Singer
Represented By: Kevin A. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NICOLA RAVENSTEIN
Represented By: Randy D. Singer
Represented By: Kevin A. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAMERON BUYTENHUYS
Represented By: Randy D. Singer
Represented By: Kevin A. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MIRANDA NADEAU
Represented By: Randy D. Singer
Represented By: Kevin A. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENNIFER HERNANDEZ
Represented By: Randy D. Singer
Represented By: Kevin A. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTI BABBITT
Represented By: Randy D. Singer
Represented By: Kevin A. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: I.M.S.
Represented By: Randy D. Singer
Represented By: Kevin A. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLEN COX
Represented By: Randy D. Singer
Represented By: Kevin A. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SYLVIA BABBITT
Represented By: Randy D. Singer
Represented By: Kevin A. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEREK PLEIMAN
Represented By: Randy D. Singer
Represented By: Kevin A. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BIANCA SMITH
Represented By: Randy D. Singer
Represented By: Kevin A. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E.B.
Represented By: Randy D. Singer
Represented By: Kevin A. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.L.N.
Represented By: Randy D. Singer
Represented By: Kevin A. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEE BABBITT, III
Represented By: Randy D. Singer
Represented By: Kevin A. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DARROLL BUYTENHUYS
Represented By: Randy D. Singer
Represented By: Kevin A. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.L.B.
Represented By: Randy D. Singer
Represented By: Kevin A. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.A.B.
Represented By: Randy D. Singer
Represented By: Kevin A. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASHLEY BABBITT
Represented By: Randy D. Singer
Represented By: Kevin A. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAYLOR-RAE SIMON
Represented By: Randy D. Singer
Represented By: Kevin A. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?