LEE v. BARR et al
Plaintiff: DANIEL LEWIS LEE
Defendant: JOHN DOES I-X, UTTAM DHILLON, KATHLEEN HAWK SAWYER, T.J. WATSON, JOSEPH MCCLAIN, RADM CHRIS A. BINA, JEFFREY E. KRUEGER, WILLIAM P. BARR and WILLIAM E. WILSON, M.D.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02559
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Tanya S Chutkan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition: Civil Rights (Other)
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Filing 15 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. WILLIAM P. BARR served on 9/3/2019; RADM CHRIS A. BINA served on 9/3/2019; UTTAM DHILLON served on 9/23/2019; JEFFREY E. KRUEGER served on 9/3/2019; JOSEPH MCCLAIN served on 9/4/2019; KATHLEEN HAWK SAWYER served on 9/3/2019; T.J. WATSON served on 9/4/2019; WILLIAM E. WILSON, M.D. served on 9/4/2019 (Van Tol, Pieter)
September 19, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS (1) Reissued Electronically as to UTTAM DHILLON (ztd)
September 19, 2019 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by DANIEL LEWIS LEE.(Hagerty, Elizabeth)
September 12, 2019 Filing 12 REPLY to opposition to motion re (2 in 1:19-mc-00145-TSC) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (The filing relates to Bourgeois v. United States Department of Justice, et al., No. 12-cv-0782-TSC) filed by ALFRED BOURGEOIS. Associated Cases: 1:19-mc-00145-TSC et al.(Kursman, Alexander)
September 11, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney (ztd)
August 29, 2019 Cases 19cv2559 TSC and Master Case 19-mc-145 TSC have been consolidated pursuant to Minute Order entered 8/29/2019. All filings shall be made solely in the Master Case. Compliance with this directive requires that you select "No" when asked "Do you want to spread this docket entry?" (ztd)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Denying [without prejudice #7 #8 #9 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for failing to fully comply with Local Civil Rule 83.2(d)(6). Affiants with offices located outside of the District of Columbia are still required to provide sufficient information for the court to determine whether the affiant engages in the practice of law from an office located in the District of Columbia. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 8/29/19. (DJS)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Consolidating action with IN THE MATTER OF THE FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS' EXECUTION PROTOCOL CASES, 19-mc-0145 (TSC). All filings shall be made solely in the Master Case. Compliance with this directive requires that you select "No" when asked "Do you want to spread this docket entry?" All counsel of record shall familiarize themselves with the directives found in the court's August 20, 2019 Order (19mc145-TSC), a copy of which is hereby attached. Consistent with the August 15, 2019 Minute Entry (19mc145-TSC), the parties shall adhere to the following schedule: Defendants shall file the administrative record on or before August 30, 2019; Plaintiffs shall complete the necessary 30(b)(6) depositions on or before February 28, 2020; and Plaintiffs shall file an amended complaint on or before March 31, 2020. To the extent Plaintiff Lee intends to seek an order enjoining his execution until further order of the court, Plaintiff Lee may seek leave to join Plaintiff Bourgeois' motion or file a separate motion. (See order and attachment for further details). Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 8/29/19. (Attachments: #1 19mc145-TSC: August 20, 2019 Order) (DJS)
August 28, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Mallik Yamusah, :Firm- Hogan Lovells US LLP, :Address- 390 Madison Avenue New York, NY 10017. Phone No. - (212) 918-3701. Fax No. - (212) 918-3100 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6347086. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by DANIEL LEWIS LEE (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mallik Yamusah, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Hagerty, Elizabeth)
August 28, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- John D. Beck, :Firm- Hogan Lovells US LLP, :Address- 390 Madison Avenue New York, NY 10017. Phone No. - (212) 918-3076. Fax No. - (212) 918-3100 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6347074. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by DANIEL LEWIS LEE (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John D. Beck, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Hagerty, Elizabeth)
August 28, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Pieter Van Tol, :Firm- Hogan Lovells US LLP, :Address- 390 Madison Avenue New York, NY 10017. Phone No. - (212) 909-0661. Fax No. - (212) 918-3100 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6347063. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by DANIEL LEWIS LEE (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Pieter Van Tol, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Hagerty, Elizabeth)
August 28, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to JOSEPH MCCLAIN. (ztd)
August 28, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by DANIEL LEWIS LEE.(Hagerty, Elizabeth)
August 27, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (7) Issued Electronically as to WILLIAM P. BARR, RADM CHRIS A. BINA, UTTAM DHILLON, JEFFREY E. KRUEGER, KATHLEEN HAWK SAWYER, T.J. WATSON, WILLIAM E. WILSON, M.D.. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zeg)
August 27, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zeg)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET (Amended) by DANIEL LEWIS LEE re #1 Complaint,,,, filed by DANIEL LEWIS LEE. Related document: #1 Complaint,,,, filed by DANIEL LEWIS LEE.(Hagerty, Elizabeth)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by DANIEL LEWIS LEE. Case related to Case No. 05-cv-2337 (TSC); 07-cv-2145 (TSC); 12-cv-0782 (TSC); 13-cv-0938 (TSC). (Hagerty, Elizabeth)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against WILLIAM P. BARR, RADM CHRIS A. BINA, UTTAM DHILLON, JOHN DOES I-X, JEFFREY E. KRUEGER, JOSEPH MCCLAIN, KATHLEEN HAWK SAWYER, T.J. WATSON, WILLIAM E. WILSON, M.D. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6339786) filed by DANIEL LEWIS LEE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2004 Bureau of Prisons Execution Protocol, #2 Exhibit B - 2008 Addendum to Bureau of Prisons Execution Protocol, #3 Exhibit C - 2019 Addendum to Bureau of Prisons Execution Protocol, #4 Exhibit D - July 25, 2019 letter regarding Lees execution date, #5 Exhibit E - July 31, 2019 letter regarding Lees execution date, #6 Exhibit F - BP-8 administrative remedy grievance form and supplement, #7 Exhibit G - Letter from House Committee on Oversight and Reform to Attorney General Barr, #8 Exhibit H - Letter from House Committee on Oversight and Reform to Acting Director Hurwitz, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Summons to William P. Barr, #11 Summons to Uttam Dhillon, #12 Summons to Kathleen Hawk Sawyer, #13 Summons to Jeffrey E. Krueger, #14 Summons to RADM Chris A. Bina, #15 Summons to T.J. Watson, #16 Summons to William E. Wilson, M.D.)(Hagerty, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LEE v. BARR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES I-X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UTTAM DHILLON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATHLEEN HAWK SAWYER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T.J. WATSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH MCCLAIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RADM CHRIS A. BINA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFREY E. KRUEGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM P. BARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM E. WILSON, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL LEWIS LEE
Represented By: Elizabeth Hagerty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?