DOWNS v. GREENSBURG CONCRETE BLOCK et al
Plaintiff: ADAM M. DOWNS
Defendant: EDWARD REPASKY, JR. and GREENSBURG CONCRETE BLOCK
Case Number: 1:2019cv02589
Filed: August 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1381
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 09/24/2019. (lcrjl3)
September 24, 2019 Filing 4 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to Greensburg Concrete Block by ADAM M. DOWNS. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Ray, James)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. GREENSBURG CONCRETE BLOCK served on 9/5/2019, answer due 9/26/2019; EDWARD REPASKY, JR served on 9/5/2019, answer due 9/26/2019 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Certificate of Service)(Ray, James)
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to GREENSBURG CONCRETE BLOCK, EDWARD REPASKY, JR. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb)
August 30, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard J. Leon. (zsb)
August 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6344908), REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by ADAM M. DOWNS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Ray, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DOWNS v. GREENSBURG CONCRETE BLOCK et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDWARD REPASKY, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREENSBURG CONCRETE BLOCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADAM M. DOWNS
Represented By: James S. Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?