MCI COMMUNICATIONS SERVICES, INC. et al v. CLARK CONSTRUCTION GROUP LLC
Plaintiff: MCIMETRO ACCESS TRANSMISSION SERVICES, INC., MCI COMMUNICATIONS SERVICES, INC. and MCIMETRO ACCESS TRANSMISSION SERVICES CORP.
Defendant: CLARK CONSTRUCTION GROUP LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv02629
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Beryl A Howell
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by CLARK CONSTRUCTION GROUP LLC.(Santini, Joseph)
October 1, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's answer or responsive pleading to the Complaint due by 10/11/2019. (hmc)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the defendant's #7 Consent Motion to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint. The defendant is DIRECTED to file its answer or other responsive pleading to the Complaint by October 11, 2019. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on September 30, 2019. (lcbah1)
September 30, 2019 Filing 8 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CLARK CONSTRUCTION GROUP LLC (Santini, Joseph)
September 30, 2019 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by CLARK CONSTRUCTION GROUP LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Santini, Joseph)
September 23, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CLARK CONSTRUCTION GROUP LLC served on 9/9/2019, answer due 9/30/2019 (Nagy, Brandon) Modified to add date of service and the answer due date 9/23/2019 (zrdj).
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on September 9, 2019. (lcbah1)
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to CLARK CONSTRUCTION GROUP LLC. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zeg)
September 6, 2019 Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zeg)
August 30, 2019 Filing 3 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by MCIMETRO ACCESS TRANSMISSION SERVICES, INC. (Nagy, Brandon)
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by MCI COMMUNICATIONS SERVICES, INC. (Nagy, Brandon)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CLARK CONSTRUCTION GROUP LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6352369) filed by MCI COMMUNICATIONS SERVICES, INC., MCIMETRO ACCESS TRANSMISSION SERVICES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Nagy, Brandon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCI COMMUNICATIONS SERVICES, INC. et al v. CLARK CONSTRUCTION GROUP LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MCIMETRO ACCESS TRANSMISSION SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: Brandon R. Nagy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MCI COMMUNICATIONS SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: Brandon R. Nagy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MCIMETRO ACCESS TRANSMISSION SERVICES CORP.
Represented By: Brandon R. Nagy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLARK CONSTRUCTION GROUP LLC
Represented By: Joseph Walter Santini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?