LUCAS v. TELECHECK SERVICES, INC. et al
Plaintiff: CEDRIC L. LUCAS
Defendant: MARK WALLIN and TELECHECK SERVICES, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02637
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Response due by 9/23/2019. (zjd)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER advising Plaintiff to respond by September 23, 2019, to Defendants' #3 Motion to Dismiss or risk dismissal of the case. See the attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 09/09/2019. (lcapm1)
September 9, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss Under FRCP 12(b)(1) and FRCP 12(b)(6), and Proposed Order by TELECHECK SERVICES, INC., MARK WALLIN (Endersby, Austen)
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal, (zeg)
September 6, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zeg)
September 5, 2019 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by TELECHECK SERVICES, INC. (Endersby, Austen)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from D.C. Superior Court, Small Claims Division, case number 2019SC3005056 Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0090-6354031 filed by TELECHECK SERVICES, INC., MARK WALLIN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Endersby, Austen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LUCAS v. TELECHECK SERVICES, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK WALLIN
Represented By: Austen C. Endersby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TELECHECK SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: Austen C. Endersby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CEDRIC L. LUCAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?