ALIKHANI et al v. POMPEO et al
Plaintiff: ALA ALIKHANI and PARINAZ ESMAEILI KHATOUNI NIJAD
Defendant: MIKE POMPEO, PHILIP FRAYNE, CARL RISCH, KEVIN MCALEENAN and JOHN DOES #1-#10
Case Number: 1:2019cv02677
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Nature of Suit: Immigration: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 9-16-19. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of mailing and service)(Nimer, Jennifer)
November 4, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/10/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/9/2019. (Nimer, Jennifer)
September 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth A. Adebonojo on behalf of PHILIP FRAYNE, KEVIN MCALEENAN, MIKE POMPEO, CARL RISCH (Adebonojo, Kenneth)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 09/16/19. (Attachment: Exhibit 1) (mac)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to PHILIP FRAYNE, KEVIN MCALEENAN, MIKE POMPEO, CARL RISCH, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zeg)
September 9, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zeg)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS AND COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6362569) filed by ALA ALIKHANI, PARINAZ ESMAEILI KHATOUNI NIJAD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I-129F Approval, #2 Exhibit DS-160 Confirmation, #3 Exhibit Interview Notice, #4 Exhibit 221(g), #5 Exhibit CEAC, #6 Exhibit SAO Email, #7 Exhibit Inquiry, #8 Exhibit Operational Q and A, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Summons USAO, #11 Summons USAG, #12 Summons Secretary of State, #13 Summons Assistant Sec. Consular Affairs, #14 Summons Acting Sec. DHS, #15 Summons CG Abu Dhabi Embassy)(Nimer, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ALIKHANI et al v. POMPEO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIKE POMPEO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILIP FRAYNE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARL RISCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN MCALEENAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES #1-#10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALA ALIKHANI
Represented By: Jennifer E. Nimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PARINAZ ESMAEILI KHATOUNI NIJAD
Represented By: Jennifer E. Nimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?