IHRIG v. US DEPARTMENT OF STATE et al
Plaintiff: ABOUD MONIR IHRIG
Defendant: CARL C. RISCH, MICHAEL R. POMPEO and US DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Case Number: 1:2019cv02691
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Nature of Suit: Immigration: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel P. Pierce on behalf of ABOUD MONIR IHRIG (Pierce, Daniel)
September 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Rhonda Lisa Campbell on behalf of All Defendants (Campbell, Rhonda)
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. MICHAEL POMPEO served on 9/13/2019; CARL RISCH served on 9/13/2019; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 9/13/2019, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/13/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/12/2019.) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Affidavit, #4 Affidavit)(Pierce, Daniel)
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to CARL RISCH, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jf)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re #1 Complaint, filed by ABOUD MONIR IHRIG. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by ABOUD MONIR IHRIG. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Pierce, Daniel)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to MICHAEL POMPEO, CARL RISCH, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zeg)
September 10, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (zeg)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MICHAEL R. POMPEO, CARL C. RISCH, US DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6365608) filed by ABOUD MONIR IHRIG. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Pierce, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IHRIG v. US DEPARTMENT OF STATE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARL C. RISCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL R. POMPEO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ABOUD MONIR IHRIG
Represented By: Daniel P. Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?