BASU v. U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES et al
Plaintiff: NAOMI BASU
Defendant: KENNETH CUCCINELLI, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, KATHY BARAN and USCIS IMMIGRANT INVESTOR PROGRAM OFFICE
Case Number: 1:2019cv02704
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Emmet G Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Immigration: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 8:1101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Carl W. Hampe on behalf of NAOMI BASU (Hampe, Carl)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 09/17/19. (Attachment: Exhibit 1) (mac)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. KATHY BARAN served on 9/12/2019; KENNETH CUCCINELLI served on 9/12/2019; U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES served on 9/12/2019; USCIS IMMIGRANT INVESTOR PROGRAM OFFICE served on 9/12/2019, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/13/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/12/2019.) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Affidavit, #4 Affidavit, #5 Affidavit)(Pierce, Daniel)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to KATHY BARAN, KENNETH CUCCINELLI, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, USCIS IMMIGRANT INVESTOR PROGRAM OFFICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zeg)
September 10, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zeg)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KATHY A. BARAN, KENNETH CUCCINELLI, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, USCIS IMMIGRANT INVESTOR PROGRAM OFFICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6368477) filed by NAOMI BASU. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Pierce, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BASU v. U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNETH CUCCINELLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATHY BARAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USCIS IMMIGRANT INVESTOR PROGRAM OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NAOMI BASU
Represented By: Daniel P. Pierce
Represented By: Carl W. Hampe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?