PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY v. BERNHARDT et al
Plaintiff: PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY
Defendant: DAVID BERNHARDT and U.S. FISH & WILDLIFE SERVICE
Case Number: 1:2019cv02708
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Emmet G Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Scheduling Order due by 11/21/2019. (mac)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff brings this action pursuant to the Freedom of Information Act ("FOIA"), 5 U.S.C. 552. The parties are directed to meet and confer and propose a joint scheduling order for further proceedings in this case by no later than November 21, 2019. The parties' joint proposed scheduling order shall address the following: (1) The status of Plaintiff's FOIA requests; (2) The anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA requests; (3) The anticipated date(s) for release of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA requests; (4) Whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case; (5) Whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case; (6) Whether this case would benefit from referral to a magistrate judge or the District Court Mediation Program for purposes of settlement; and (7) A proposed briefing schedule for dispositive motions, if applicable. If the parties are unable to agree on a joint recommendation, the joint proposed scheduling order shall include each party's individual recommendations. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 10/31/2019. (lcegs3)
October 30, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by DAVID BERNHARDT, U.S. FISH & WILDLIFE SERVICE.(Braswell, Marina)
October 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Marina Utgoff Braswell on behalf of DAVID BERNHARDT, U.S. FISH & WILDLIFE SERVICE (Braswell, Marina)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 09/23/19. (Attachment: Exhibit 1) (mac)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to DAVID BERNHARDT, U.S. FISH & WILDLIFE SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zeg)
September 16, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zeg)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 ERRATA to Plaintiff's Complaint by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY #1 Complaint, filed by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Jenkins, Peter)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY (zeg)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6369184) filed by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration Local Rule Declaration, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Jenkins, Peter) (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/16/2019) (zeg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY v. BERNHARDT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID BERNHARDT
Represented By: Marina Utgoff Braswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. FISH & WILDLIFE SERVICE
Represented By: Marina Utgoff Braswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY
Represented By: Peter T. Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?