POTOMAC ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY v. WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY
Plaintiff: POTOMAC ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY
Defendant: WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY
Case Number: 1:2019cv02709
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Memorandum in Opposition due by 11/22/2019. (zcal)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' #10 Joint Motion for Extension of Time, it is ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Accordingly, plaintiff shall file its Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss on or before November 22, 2019. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on October 31, 2019. (lcdlf2)
October 30, 2019 Filing 10 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants Motion to Dismiss by POTOMAC ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Freeman, Martin)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff's #9 Praecipe Showing Cause Why This Case Should Not Be Dismissed Without Prejudice for Failure to Prosecute establishes that good cause exists for not dismissing this case. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that plaintiff shall file, on or before November 1, 2019, an opposition to defendant's #2 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on October 24, 2019. (lcdlf2)
October 24, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT, Praecipe Showing Cause Why This Case Should Not be Dismissed Without Prejudice for Failure to Prosecute Pursuant to Rule 83.23 of the Local Rules by POTOMAC ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY re Order,, Set Deadlines, #2 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Freeman, Martin); Modified event and text on 10/25/2019 (ztth).
October 23, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Martin H. Freeman on behalf of POTOMAC ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY (Freeman, Martin)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The defendant filed its #2 Motion to Dismiss on September 10, 2019, but the plaintiff has yet to respond to the motion. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that the plaintiff shall show cause on or before October 25, 2019 why this case should not be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute pursuant to Rule 83.23 of the Local Rules. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on October 18, 2019. (lcdlf2)
September 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY (Attachments: #1 Superior Court Documents)(Cuthbertson, James)
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by M. Richard Coel on behalf of WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY (Coel, M.)
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal, (zeg)
September 11, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zeg)
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by James Douglas Cuthbertson on behalf of WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY (Cuthbertson, James)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY (Cuthbertson, James)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss by WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cuthbertson, James)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the District of Columbia, case number 2019 CA 004879 B Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0090-6369642 filed by WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY. (Attachments: #1 Superior Court Documents Summons, #2 Superior Court Documents Initial Order, #3 Superior Court Documents Information Sheet, #4 Superior Court Documents Complaint, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cuthbertson, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: POTOMAC ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY v. WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY
Represented By: James Douglas Cuthbertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: POTOMAC ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?