ARNOLD, et al v. SECRETARY OF THE NAVY et al
Plaintiff: JOSEPH DUFOUR, ANDREW CALHOUN, TIMOTHY DEMY, DENISE Y. MERRITT, RENE PORTER-STEWART, RAFAEL J. QUILES, MICHAEL LAVELLE, ARMANDO TORRALVA, MICHAEL BELT, GEORGE W. LINZEY, MARTHA CARSON, JAIRO MORENO, JAMES LOOBY, RICK P. BRADLEY, DAVID MITCHELL, DAVID S. WILDER, DANIEL ROYSDEN, RICHARD ARNOLD, FURNISS HARKNESS, ALAN GARNER, TOM KLAPPERT, ALLEN L. LANCASTER, WILLIAM C. BLAIR, JOHN GORDY, BARBY EARL WILSON, WALKER MARSH, JR. and MARY HELEN SPALDING
Defendant: NAVY CHIEF OF CHAPLAINS, SECRETARY OF THE NAVY and CHIEF OF NAVAL PERSONNEL
Case Number: 1:2019cv02755
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: John D Bates
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION to Dismiss by CHIEF OF NAVAL PERSONNEL, NAVY CHIEF OF CHAPLAINS, SECRETARY OF THE NAVY (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Patil, Chetan)
October 22, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss shall be filed by 11/1/2019; Plaintiffs Response is due by 12/16/2019; Defendants Reply, if any, is due by 1/15/2020. (jth)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to the status conference held on September 30, 2019, it is hereby ORDERED that defendants' motion to dismiss shall be filed by not later than November 1, 2019; plaintiffs shall file their response by not later than December 16, 2019; and defendants shall file their reply in support of the motion to dismiss by not later than January 15, 2020. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 10/22/2019. (lcjdb1)
September 30, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John D. Bates: Status Conference held on 9/30/2019. Scheduling Order to be Issued. (Court Reporter: Bryan A. Wayne) (jth)
September 26, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Chetan A. Patil on behalf of All Defendants (Patil, Chetan)
September 18, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 9/30/2019 at 02:15 PM in Courtroom 30A before Judge John D. Bates. (tb)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that a status conference is scheduled on September 30, 2019, at 2:15 p.m. in Courtroom 30A. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 9/16/19. (lcjdb1)
September 16, 2019 Filing 27 Case transferred in from District of Virginia Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-00095. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 OPINION & ORDER granting in part and denying in part #9 Motion to Change Venue. See Opinion & Order for details. Copies distributed to all counsel. Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr on 9/12/2019. (clou ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 9/16/2019.]
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 MOTION for Extension (Unopposed) for a Nine Minute Extension to File a Supplemental Brief. Copies distributed to all counsel. Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr on 6/25/2019. (clou ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 9/16/2019.]
June 25, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Extension (Unopposed) for a Nine Minute Extension to File a Supplemental Brief by Richard Arnold, Michael Belt, William C. Blair, Rick P. Bradley, Andrew Calhoun, Martha Carson, Timothy Demy, Joseph Dufour, Alan Garner, John Gordy, Furniss Harkness, Tom Klappert, Allen L. Lancaster, Michael Lavelle, George W. Linzey, James Looby, Walker Marsh, Jr, Denise Y. Merritt, David Mitchell, Jairo Moreno, Rene Porter-Stewart, Rafael J. Quiles, Daniel Roysden, Mary Helen Spalding, Armando Torralva, David S. Wilder, Barby Earl Wilson. (Schulcz, Arthur) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 9/16/2019.]
June 25, 2019 Filing 23 Memorandum & Supplemental Brief in response to #20 Motion Hearing,, filed by Richard Arnold, Michael Belt, William C. Blair, Rick P. Bradley, Andrew Calhoun, Martha Carson, Timothy Demy, Joseph Dufour, Alan Garner, John Gordy, Furniss Harkness, Tom Klappert, Allen L. Lancaster, Michael Lavelle, George W. Linzey, James Looby, Walker Marsh, Jr, Denise Y. Merritt, David Mitchell, Jairo Moreno, Rene Porter-Stewart, Rafael J. Quiles, Daniel Roysden, Mary Helen Spalding, Armando Torralva, David S. Wilder, Barby Earl Wilson. (Schulcz, Arthur) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 9/16/2019.]
June 24, 2019 Filing 22 Brief in Support to #9 MOTION to Change Venue filed by The Chief of Naval Personnel, The Navy Chief of Chaplains, The Secretary of the Navy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Hartlieb, Garry) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 9/16/2019.]
June 17, 2019 Filing 21 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings (Motion to Change Venue) held on 06-13-2019, before Judge Henry Coke Morgan, Jr., Court Reporter/Transcriber Carol Naughton, Telephone number,757-222-7073. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 7/17/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/19/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/16/2019.(naughton, carol) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 9/16/2019.]
June 13, 2019 Filing 20 Motion Hearing before District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr. held on 6/13/2019 re #9 MOTION to Change Venue filed by The Secretary of the Navy. Appearances: Arthur A. Schulcz, Sr. for the Plaintiffs. Chetan Patil and Joel E. Wilson for the Defendants. Arguments of counsel heard. Comments of Court. This case has been in the District of Columbia circuit for several years and has had 5 years of discovery. Both parties have 10 days to submit further briefs regarding the severance of the individual claims by Judge Bates, District of Columbia. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter Carol Naughton, OCR.)(lbax, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 9/16/2019.]
May 16, 2019 Motion Hearing as to #9 MOTION to Change Venue set for 6/13/2019 at 02:30 PM in Norfolk Courtroom 2 before District Judge Henry C. Morgan Jr.. (lbax, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 9/16/2019.]
May 14, 2019 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Change Venue filed by The Chief of Naval Personnel, The Navy Chief of Chaplains, The Secretary of the Navy. (Hartlieb, Garry) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 9/16/2019.]
May 8, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Richard Arnold, Michael Belt, William C. Blair, Rick P. Bradley, Andrew Calhoun, Martha Carson, Timothy Demy, Joseph Dufour, Alan Garner, John Gordy, Furniss Harkness, Tom Klappert, Allen L. Lancaster, Michael Lavelle, George W. Linzey, James Looby, Walker Marsh, Jr, Denise Y. Merritt, David Mitchell, Jairo Moreno, Rene Porter-Stewart, Rafael J. Quiles, Daniel Roysden, Mary Helen Spalding, Armando Torralva, David S. Wilder, Barby Earl Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Extract Adair Docket, #2 Exhibit 2 DC Decisions, #3 Exhibit 3 Discovery History, #4 Exhibit 4 Exracts DODIG, #5 Exhibit 5 Complaint Counts 1-5, #6 Exhibit 6 RADM Black NIG, #7 Exhibit 7 Washburn NIG, #8 Exhibit 8 AAS Decl)(Schulcz, Arthur) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 9/16/2019.]
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Pro hac vice for Chetan Patil as to The Chief of Naval Personnel, The Navy Chief of Chaplains and The Secretary of the Navy. Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr on 5/3/19. (tlev, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 9/16/2019.]
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 MOTION to Stay, Modify Pretrial Order, and for Protective Order. ORDERED that all case proceedings, including Defendants' Answer or Rule 12 Motion, are stayed. Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr on 5/3/2019. (clou ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 9/16/2019.]
April 30, 2019 Filing 15 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Chetan Patil and Certification of Local Counsel Garry D. Hartlieb by The Chief of Naval Personnel, The Navy Chief of Chaplains, The Secretary of the Navy. (Hartlieb, Garry) Modified text and event on 4/30/2019 (clou ). [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 9/16/2019.]
April 30, 2019 Notice of Correction re #13 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Chetan Patil and Certification of Local Counsel Garry D. Hartlieb. The motion does not match the docket entry regarding parties represented. Counsel should refile the motion with the corrected information. (tlev, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 9/16/2019.]
April 29, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Stay , Modify Pretrial Order, and for Protective Order by The Chief of Naval Personnel, The Navy Chief of Chaplains, The Secretary of the Navy . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (Agreed))(Hartlieb, Garry) Modified docket text on 4/30/2019 (clou ). [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 9/16/2019.]
April 29, 2019 Filing 13 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Chetan Patil and Certification of Local Counsel by The Secretary of the Navy. (Hartlieb, Garry) Modified on 4/30/2019 to correct docket event (clou ). [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 9/16/2019.]
April 26, 2019 Notice of Correction re #8 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Chetan Patil and Certification of Local Counsel Garry D. Hartlieb . The motion does not contain the signature of the applicant. Local counsel should file a corrected motion that includes the written signature of the applicant. Counsel should not pay a second fee. (tlev, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 9/16/2019.]
April 25, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Joel Eric Wilson on behalf of The Chief of Naval Personnel, The Navy Chief of Chaplains, The Secretary of the Navy (Wilson, Joel) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 9/16/2019.]
April 24, 2019 Filing 11 Request for Hearing by The Secretary of the Navy re #9 MOTION to Change Venue (Hartlieb, Garry) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 9/16/2019.]
April 24, 2019 Filing 10 Memorandum in Support re #9 MOTION to Change Venue filed by The Secretary of the Navy. (Hartlieb, Garry) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 9/16/2019.]
April 24, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Change Venue by The Chief of Naval Personnel, The Navy Chief of Chaplains, The Secretary of the Navy. (Hartlieb, Garry) Modified text on 4/30/2019 (clou ). [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 9/16/2019.]
April 24, 2019 Filing 8 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Chetan Patil and Certification of Local Counsel Garry D. Hartlieb by The Secretary of the Navy. (Hartlieb, Garry) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 9/16/2019.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 7 Certificate and AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint & Summons served on Sec. of Navy, Chief of Naval Personnel, Navy Chief of Chaplains on 03/07/2019, filed by Richard Arnold, Michael Belt, William C. Blair, Rick P. Bradley, Andrew Calhoun, Martha Carson, Timothy Demy, Joseph Dufour, Alan Garner, John Gordy, Furniss Harkness, Tom Klappert, Allen L. Lancaster, Michael Lavelle, George W. Linzey, James Looby, Walker Marsh, Jr, Denise Y. Merritt, David Mitchell, Jairo Moreno, Rene Porter-Stewart, Rafael J. Quiles, Daniel Roysden, Mary Helen Spalding, Armando Torralva, David S. Wilder, Barby Earl Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 3 Issued Summons, #2 Exhibit 2 USPS for Sec. of Navy, #3 Exhibit 3 USPS US Aty EDVA, #4 Exhibit 4 USPS US AG)(Schulcz, Arthur) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 9/16/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RULE 26(f) PRETRIAL ORDER: Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference set for 5/8/2019 at 09:30 AM in Norfolk - Clerk's Office Conference Room, 1st Floor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller on 4/16/19. (lbax, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 9/16/2019.]
March 19, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service re #1 Complaint,,,, by Garry D. Hartlieb on behalf of All Defendants (Hartlieb, Garry) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 9/16/2019.]
March 3, 2019 Filing 4 EXHIBIT Errata for Exhibit 2 re #1 Complaint by Richard Arnold, Michael Belt, William C. Blair, Rick P. Bradley, Andrew Calhoun, Martha Carson, Timothy Demy, Joseph Dufour, Alan Garner, John Gordy, Furniss Harkness, Tom Klappert, Allen L. Lancaster, Michael Lavelle, George W. Linzey, James Looby, Walker Marsh, Jr, Denise Y. Merritt, David Mitchell, Jairo Moreno, Rene Porter-Stewart, Rafael J. Quiles, Daniel Roysden, Mary Helen Spalding, Armando Torralva, David S. Wilder, Barby Earl Wilson.. (Attachments: #1 Errata Exhibit 2)(Schulcz, Arthur) Modified text on 3/4/2019 (clou ). [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 9/16/2019.]
March 1, 2019 Filing 3 Three (3) Summonses Issued as to The Chief of Naval Personnel, The Navy Chief of Chaplains, The Secretary of the Navy. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Civil Motions Procedures)(epri, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 9/16/2019.]
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons by Richard Arnold, Michael Belt, William C. Blair, Rick P. Bradley, Andrew Calhoun, Martha Carson, Timothy Demy, Joseph Dufour, Alan Garner, John Gordy, Furniss Harkness, Tom Klappert, Allen L. Lancaster, Michael Lavelle, George W. Linzey, James Looby, Walker Marsh, Jr, Denise Y. Merritt, David Mitchell, Jairo Moreno, Rene Porter-Stewart, Rafael J. Quiles, Daniel Roysden, Mary Helen Spalding, Armando Torralva, David S. Wilder, Barby Earl Wilson. (Schulcz, Arthur) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 9/16/2019.]
March 1, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller. (epri, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 9/16/2019.]
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6517015.), filed by Alan Garner, Jairo Moreno, Andrew Calhoun, Armando Torralva, Barby Earl Wilson, James Looby, Edith Rene' Porter-Stewart, Allen L Lancaster, Walker Marsh Jr, Rafael J. Quiles, George W. Linzey, Furniss Harkness, David S. Wilder, Mary Helen Spalding, Rick P Bradley, Richard Arnold, Timothy Demy, John Gordy, David Mitchell, Thomas Klappert, Michael Lavelle, Martha Carson, Michael Belt, Daniel Roysden, Denise Y Merritt, Joseph Dufour, William C Blair. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Pls Retaliation Claims, #2 Exhibit 2 Leuba 38 Yrs, #3 Exhibit 3 CHC Blackball Machine, #4 Exhibit 4 RADM Black's NIG Test, #5 Exhibit 5 Washburn NIG Testimony, #6 Exhibit 6 CHC Bd Mbrs Denom, #7 Exhibit 7 Dickerson Decl, #8 Exhibit 8 Stafford Report, #9 Exhibit 9 Demy Declaration, #10 Exhibit 10 Gary Heinke Decl, #11 Exhibit 11 Ellis Report, #12 Exhibit 12 CNA Denom Prom %, #13 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schulcz, Arthur) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 9/16/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ARNOLD, et al v. SECRETARY OF THE NAVY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH DUFOUR
Represented By: Arthur A. Schulcz, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDREW CALHOUN
Represented By: Arthur A. Schulcz, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY DEMY
Represented By: Arthur A. Schulcz, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENISE Y. MERRITT
Represented By: Arthur A. Schulcz, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RENE PORTER-STEWART
Represented By: Arthur A. Schulcz, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAFAEL J. QUILES
Represented By: Arthur A. Schulcz, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL LAVELLE
Represented By: Arthur A. Schulcz, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARMANDO TORRALVA
Represented By: Arthur A. Schulcz, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL BELT
Represented By: Arthur A. Schulcz, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEORGE W. LINZEY
Represented By: Arthur A. Schulcz, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARTHA CARSON
Represented By: Arthur A. Schulcz, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAIRO MORENO
Represented By: Arthur A. Schulcz, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES LOOBY
Represented By: Arthur A. Schulcz, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICK P. BRADLEY
Represented By: Arthur A. Schulcz, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID MITCHELL
Represented By: Arthur A. Schulcz, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID S. WILDER
Represented By: Arthur A. Schulcz, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL ROYSDEN
Represented By: Arthur A. Schulcz, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD ARNOLD
Represented By: Arthur A. Schulcz, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FURNISS HARKNESS
Represented By: Arthur A. Schulcz, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALAN GARNER
Represented By: Arthur A. Schulcz, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TOM KLAPPERT
Represented By: Arthur A. Schulcz, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLEN L. LANCASTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM C. BLAIR
Represented By: Arthur A. Schulcz, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN GORDY
Represented By: Arthur A. Schulcz, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARBY EARL WILSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WALKER MARSH, JR.
Represented By: Arthur A. Schulcz, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARY HELEN SPALDING
Represented By: Arthur A. Schulcz, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NAVY CHIEF OF CHAPLAINS
Represented By: Chetan A. Patil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SECRETARY OF THE NAVY
Represented By: Chetan A. Patil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHIEF OF NAVAL PERSONNEL
Represented By: Chetan A. Patil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?